Global Patent Index - EP 1316644 A1

EP 1316644 A1 2003-06-04 - Method for facilitating the transfer of a running fibrous web, such as a paper, board or tissue web

Title (en)

Method for facilitating the transfer of a running fibrous web, such as a paper, board or tissue web

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Unterstützung der Übergabe einer laufenden Papier-, Karton-, Tissue- oder anderen Faserstoffbahn

Title (fr)

Procédé pour faciliter le transfert d'une bande fibreuse en mouvement, telle qu'une bande de papier, de carton ou de papier tissu

Publication

EP 1316644 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02025950 A

Priority

DE 10159319 A

Abstract (en)

To support the movement of a web (1) in its free movement path between rollers (2,7), at a production/finishing machine for webs of paper or cardboard or tissue, the pressure is equalized on the upper surface (OB) and the under surface (UB) of the web at the wedge gaps (10,11) between the rollers. Air is blown against the upper web surface and immediately deflected outwards (12a,12b) so that the upper roller gap is sealed at the same time against the entry of a layer of air carried by the web surface. The pressure is reduced within the entry roller gap to an underpressure. The air is blown at a rate of 50-100 m<3>/hour/m of web width, and preferably 80 m<3>/hour, at a speed of 25-80 m/second.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zur Unterstützung der Übergabe einer laufenden Papier, Karton, Tissue- oder anderen Faserstoffbahn (1) von einer Walze (2 ), die die Faserstoffbahn (1) abgibt an eine Walze (7), die die Faserstoffbahn (1) übernimmt, innerhalb einer Maschine zur Herstellung und/oder Veredelung der Faserstoffbahn(1), wobei zwischen diesen Walzen (2,7) die Faserstoffbahn (1) mit ihrer Oberseite (OB) in einem Einlaufzwickel (10) und mit ihrer Unterseite (UB) in einem sich öffnenden Zwickel (11) im freien Zug läuft. Erfindungsgemäß wird ein Druckausgleich zwischen den genannten Zwickeln (10,11) mit zunächst in Richtung der Oberseite (OB) der Faserstoffbahn (1) geblasener und sofort nach außen umgelenkter Blasluft (12,12a) geschaffen und der Einlaufzwickel (10) gleichzeitig gegen eindringende Luftgrenzschicht (LG) abgedichtet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21G 9/00; D21F 3/04; D21F 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/04 (2006.01); D21F 5/04 (2006.01); D21G 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/04 (2013.01); D21F 5/042 (2013.01); D21G 9/0063 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1316644 A1 20030604; EP 1316644 B1 20060524; AT 327378 T 20060615; DE 10159319 A1 20030612; DE 50206874 D1 20060629

INPADOC legal status


2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130601

2013-09-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50206874

- Effective date: 20130601

2013-08-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121121

2013-07-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121122

2013-07-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121121

2013-07-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 327378 T

- Effective date: 20121121

2012-01-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20111114

- Year of fee payment: 10

2012-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20111128

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101119

- Year of fee payment: 9

2011-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20101112

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070227

2006-09-13 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: VOITH PATENT GMBH

2006-09-05 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-06-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50206874 P 20060629

2006-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2005-06-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050414

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2004-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031204

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI