Global Patent Index - EP 1316663 A1

EP 1316663 A1 2003-06-04 - Overhead door track structure

Title (en)

Overhead door track structure

Title (de)

Führungsschienenaufbau für ein Kipptor

Title (fr)

Structure de rail pour porte basculante

Publication

EP 1316663 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 02258855 A

Priority

  • EP 98937099 A
  • US 5382097 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1314845A2] A rigid-panel overhead door which is selectively moved up and down to open and close an opening and which is guided generally along door guides on opposed vertical sides of the opening is disclosed. The door includes a first chain disposed along one of the door guides and a second chain disposed along an opposed door guide. The door further includes a plurality of panels, each having a first end and a second end, the panels being of sufficient length to extend substantially across the opening but sufficiently limited in length so as to fit between the first and second chains and not extend beyond them. The door further includes a plurality of connectors for joining the first and second chains respectively to the first and second ends of each of the panels. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 15/24; E06B 9/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/16 (2006.01); E05D 15/24 (2006.01); E06B 3/48 (2006.01); E06B 9/06 (2006.01); E06B 9/08 (2006.01); E05F 15/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/08 (2013.01); E05D 15/165 (2013.01); E05D 15/24 (2013.01); E06B 3/485 (2013.01); E05D 15/242 (2013.01); E05F 15/668 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/684 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/00 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/106 (2013.01); E06B 9/0669 (2013.01); E06B 2009/587 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1314845 A2 20030528; EP 1314845 A3 20030604; EP 1314845 B1 20041124; EP 1316663 A1 20030604; EP 1316663 B1 20040519; EP 1316664 A1 20030604; EP 1316664 B1 20041201

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-25 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20180723

2018-07-24 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 60200510

2017-11-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20170724

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-11-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170720

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170724

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170719

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170721

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170724

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170724

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170720

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170724

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20170719

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-09-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170720

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-07-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2008-11-21 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2008-08-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: EFAFLEX TOR- UND SICHERHEITSSYSTEME GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20080523

2008-06-25 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: EFAFLEX TOR- UND SICHERHEITSSYSTEME GMBH & CO. KG

- Free text: EFAFLEX TRANSPORT- UND LAGERTECHNIK GMBH#FLIEDERSTRASSE 14#84079 BRUCKBERG (DE) -TRANSFER TO- EFAFLEX TOR- UND SICHERHEITSSYSTEME GMBH & CO. KG#FLIEDERSTRASSE 14#84079 BRUCKBERG (DE)

2008-04-09 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041019

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2005-05-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050222

2005-03-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: EFAFLEX TRANSPORT- UND LAGERTECHNIK GMBH

2005-02-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-01-03 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: EFAFLEX TRANSPORT- UND LAGERTECHNIK GMBH

2004-11-24 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2004-11-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2004-11-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: EFAFLEX TRANSPORT- UND LAGERTECHNIK GMBH

- Free text: RYTEC CORPORATION#ONE CEDAR PARKWAY, P.O. BOX 403#JACKSON, WISCONSIN 53037-0403 (US) -TRANSFER TO- EFAFLEX TRANSPORT- UND LAGERTECHNIK GMBH#FLIEDERSTRASSE 14#84079 BRUCKBERG (DE)

2004-11-03 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: EFAFLEX TRANSPORT- UND LAGERTECHNIK GMBH

2004-09-14 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-08-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040830

2004-08-19 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040819

2004-08-19 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040819

2004-06-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60200510 P 20040624

2004-06-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-05-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-05-19 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0998617 P

2004-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2004-05-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2003-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030113

2003-06-04 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0998617 P

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE