Global Patent Index - EP 1316666 A1

EP 1316666 A1 2003-06-04 - Compact cable window-lifter

Title (en)

Compact cable window-lifter

Title (de)

Kompakter Seilfensterheber

Title (fr)

Lève-vitre compact à câble

Publication

EP 1316666 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02292922 A

Priority

FR 0115443 A

Abstract (en)

The window drive has an attachment (2) to the window glass, a motor (6) that drives a cable that is offset relative to the attachment, first (3) and second (4) cable returns at one end of the travel of the attachment, a third cable return (5) at the other end of the travel of the attachment, and a cable (7) fixed to the attachment.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un lève-vitre comprenant : un élément de liaison de vitre (2) ; un élément moteur (6) d'entraînement de câble, désaxé par rapport à la course de l'élément de liaison (2); des premier (3) et deuxième (4) renvois de câble disposés à une extrémité de la course de l'élément de liaison et superposés; un troisième renvoi (5) de câble disposé à une autre extrémité de la course de l'élément de liaison ; un câble (7) solidaire de l'élément de liaison de vitre. Ce lève-vitre présente notamment une compacité accrue. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05F 11/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05F 11/48 (2006.01); E05F 15/16 (2006.01); E05F 11/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05F 11/486 (2013.01); E05F 15/689 (2013.01); E05F 11/385 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/654 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/668 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/60 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/55 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1316666 A1 20030604; EP 1316666 B1 20050727; DE 60205200 D1 20050901; DE 60205200 T2 20060601; ES 2247284 T3 20060301; FR 2832753 A1 20030530; FR 2832753 B1 20041001; US 2003101654 A1 20030605; US 6874280 B2 20050405

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071126

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080603

2008-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061127

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2008-02-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20061127

2007-08-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070731

2006-12-07 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061207

- Year of fee payment: 5

2006-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061130

- Year of fee payment: 5

2006-07-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060428

2006-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2247284 T3

2006-02-22 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20050727

2005-11-24 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20051124

- Year of fee payment: 4

2005-11-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20051117

- Year of fee payment: 4

2005-09-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60205200 P 20050901

2005-07-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2005-07-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-07-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050727

2004-05-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031025

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI