Global Patent Index - EP 1316683 A2

EP 1316683 A2 2003-06-04 - Oil pump combination for an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Oil pump combination for an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Ölpumpenkombination für eine Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Combinaison des pompes à huile pour un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1316683 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02025133 A

Priority

DE 10159088 A

Abstract (en)

Oil pump combination comprises a main oil pump (10) having a pump housing for suctioning lubricating oil located in an oil collecting device (2); and an oil suction pump (54) for an exhaust gas turbocharger of an I.C. engine. At least two pump chambers are arranged in the pump housing with each chamber containing a pair of toothed wheels (42) for forming a pumping stage. Both toothed wheels of the main oil pump and drive toothed wheels of the oil suction pump are arranged under each other as well as angled toward each other. <??>Preferred Features: Both toothed wheels of the main oil pump and the oil suction pump are arranged below each other by 1/2 tooth and angled toward each other by 1/4 tooth.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung geht aus von einer Ölpumpenkombination für eine mit zwei Zylinderreihen versehene aufgeladene Brennkraftmaschine, die folgende Merkmale aufweist: eine mit einem Pumpengehäuse versehene Hauptölpumpe (10) zur Absaugung des in einer Ölauffangvorrichtung (2) befindlichen Schmieröls, im Pumpengehäuse sind mindestens zwei Pumpenräume ausgebildet, wobei in jedem Pumpenraum ein Paar von ineinander kämmenden Zahnrädern (30, 32 bzw. 40, 42) zur Ausbildung jeweils einer Pumpenstufe angeordnet ist, eine mit zwei Pumpenräumen versehene Ölabsaugpumpe (54) für die Abgasturbolader der Brennkraftmaschine, wobei in jedem Pumpenraum jeweils ein Paar von ineinander kämmenden Zahnrädern (78, 80 bzw. 82, 84) zur Ausbildung jeweils einer Pumpenstufe (62, 64) angeordnet ist, die beiden Antriebszahnräder (30, 40) der Hauptölpumpe (10) und die beiden Antriebszahnräder (78, 82) der Ölabsaugpumpe (54) sind sowohl untereinander als auch zueinander drehwinkelversetzt angeordnet. Die drehwinkelversetzte Anordnung der Zahnräder führt zu geringeren Gesamt-Geräuschamplituden der Ölpumpenkombination. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01M 1/02; F04C 2/16; F04C 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01M 1/02 (2006.01); F01M 1/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01M 1/02 (2013.01); F01M 2001/0269 (2013.01); F01M 2001/123 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1316683 A2 20030604; EP 1316683 A3 20040121; EP 1316683 B1 20050525; DE 10159088 A1 20030618

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170601

2017-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161130

2017-08-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170731

2017-06-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50203186

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151119

- Year of fee payment: 14

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151105

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-11-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111109

2012-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111109

2012-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111109

2011-04-27 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110331 AND 20110406

2011-04-06 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110310 AND 20110316

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101124

- Year of fee payment: 9

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101118

- Year of fee payment: 9

2011-02-04 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2009-11-27 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2009-07-10 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2006-05-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-03-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-09-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050907

2005-06-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50203186 P 20050630

2005-05-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-05-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-10-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-09-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040721

2004-01-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 01M 1/02 A

2004-01-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 04C 11/00 B

2004-01-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 04C 2/16 B

2004-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-01-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI