Global Patent Index - EP 1316684 A2

EP 1316684 A2 2003-06-04 - Oil collecting device and oil pump for an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Oil collecting device and oil pump for an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Ölauffangvorrichtung und Ölpumpe für eine Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif de recuperation d'huile et pompe d'huile pour un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1316684 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02023997 A

Priority

DE 10159090 A

Abstract (en)

Oil collecting device (2) comprises an oil collecting housing arranged below a crank housing and having at least two oil collecting chambers. An oil pump with two pumping stages is arranged in a first oil collecting chamber. The housing of the oil pump has an opening (48) on its upper side connecting the pressure side of a second pump stage. Oil suctioned from the second oil collecting chamber is transferred to a first oil collecting chamber. <??>Preferred Features: The opening is enclosed by a sink-like edge (50). A pressure limiting valve connected to the pressure side of the first pump stage is provided in the housing of the oil pump.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Ölauffangvorrichtung und eine Ölpumpe für eine Brennkraftmaschine mit einem unterhalb eines Kurbelgehäuses (8) angeordneten Ölauffanggehäuse (2), das mindestens zwei Ölsammelräume (12, 20) aufweist, wobei in einem ersten Ölsammelraum (12) eine Ölpumpe (10) mit zwei Pumpenstufen (18, 26) angeordnet ist, an deren beiden Absaugstufen (34, 44) jeweils eine Ölabsaugleitung (16, 24) angeschlossen ist, wobei die erste Ölabsaugleitung (16) in den ersten Ölsammelraum eingreift, um das Schmieröl über die Druckseite (36) der ersten Pumpenstufe (18) zu den Verbrauchern zu fördern und dass die zweite mit der zweiten Absaugstufe (44) verbundene Ölabsaugleitung (24) zu'einem zweiten Ölsammelraum (20) führt. Es wird vorgeschlagen, dass das Gehäuse (10a) der Ölpumpe (10) auf seiner Oberseite eine mit der Druckseite (46) der zweiten Pumpenstufe (26) verbundene Öffnung (48) aufweist, über die das aus dem zweiten Ölsammelraum (20) abgesaugte Öl in den ersten Ölsammelraum (12) überführt wird. Damit wird auf einfache Art und Weise eine Entschäumung des abgesaugten Schmieröls erreicht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01M 11/00; F01M 1/00; F16N 13/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01M 1/02 (2006.01); F01M 1/16 (2006.01); F01M 11/00 (2006.01); F02F 7/00 (2006.01); F01M 1/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01M 1/02 (2013.01); F01M 2001/123 (2013.01); F01M 2011/0041 (2013.01); F01M 2011/007 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1316684 A2 20030604; EP 1316684 A3 20031105; EP 1316684 B1 20050504; AT 294918 T 20050515; DE 10159090 A1 20030612; DE 10159090 C2 20030911; JP 2003193816 A 20030709; US 2003152464 A1 20030814; US 6811383 B2 20041102

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170929

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161026

2017-06-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20161026

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151021

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111102

2012-07-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120629

2011-04-27 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110331 AND 20110406

2011-04-06 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110310 AND 20110316

2011-02-04 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20101104

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-11-27 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2009-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081026

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081026

2009-07-10 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071022

- Year of fee payment: 6

2008-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20071015

- Year of fee payment: 6

2006-04-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060207

2006-03-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-10-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050919

2005-06-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50202986 P 20050609

2005-06-01 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-05-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

2005-05-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-07-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

2004-07-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040604

2004-07-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040506

2003-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-11-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-11-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 01M 11/00 A

2003-11-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 01M 1/00 B

2003-11-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 16N 13/20 B

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI