Global Patent Index - EP 1316687 A1

EP 1316687 A1 2003-06-04 - Particulate filter for diesel engines

Title (en)

Particulate filter for diesel engines

Title (de)

Partikelfilter für Dieselmotoren

Title (fr)

Filtres à particules pour moteurs diesel

Publication

EP 1316687 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 02079020 A

Priority

GB 0128772 A

Abstract (en)

A particulate filter (10) for positioning in an exhaust system (12) from a diesel engine (14) comprising a housing (20); the housing having a first end (22) with a opening (26) for the flow of exhaust gases, and a second end (24) with an opening (28) for the flow of exhaust gases; and a filter substrate (30) positioned inside the housing between the opening in the first end and the opening in the second end, the filter substrate having a first surface (40) open to the opening in the first end but substantially closed from the opening in the second end, and a second surface (42) open to the opening in the second end but substantially closed from the opening in the first end; wherein the first surface and the second surface are capable of trapping ash material; and wherein the opening in the first end is substantially identical to the opening in the second end such that the housing can be positioned in the exhaust system either with the opening in the first end allowing flow of exhaust gases into the housing from the diesel engine, or with the opening in the second end allowing flow of exhaust gases into the housing from the diesel engine. Ash removal from the filter substrate can be easily achieved by reversing the position of the particulate filter relative to the exhaust system. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01N 3/022

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01N 3/022 (2006.01); F01N 3/021 (2006.01); F01N 3/023 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01N 3/0217 (2013.01); F01N 3/0222 (2013.01); F01N 3/0233 (2013.01); F01N 2330/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1316687 A1 20030604; GB 0128772 D0 20020123

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040803

2004-03-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040121

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031204

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI