Global Patent Index - EP 1316696 A2

EP 1316696 A2 2003-06-04 - Control device for a fan and method for operating same

Title (en)

Control device for a fan and method for operating same

Title (de)

Steuergerät für einen Kühlerlüfter und zugehöriges Betriebsverfahren

Title (fr)

Dispositif de commande pour un ventilateur et procédé de fonctionnement associé

Publication

EP 1316696 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02026572 A

Priority

DE 10158917 A

Abstract (en)

The Controller determines the demand value for the fan's revolution rate depending on the engine load. It increases the fan's revolution rate during an engine braking phase and reduces it after the end of the engine braking phase. The revolution rate after the engine braking phase can be reduced to a lower value than that prior to the engine braking phase. <??>AN Independent claim is also included for the following: a method for controlling or regulating the revolution rate of a cooling fan motor for a heat exchanger of a motor vehicle engine.

Abstract (de)

Das Steuergerät zur Drehzahlsteuerung oder -regelung eines Kühlerlüftermotors für einen Wärmetauscher eines Kraftfahrzeugmotors ist zum Festlegen eines Sollwerts für die Lüfterdrehzahl in Abhängigkeit von der Motorlast ausgebildet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01P 7/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01P 7/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01P 7/048 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19951362 A1 20010503 - BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1316696 A2 20030604; EP 1316696 A3 20040915; DE 10158917 A1 20030618; DE 10158917 B4 20060119

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-14 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051022

2005-06-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-05-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050315

2004-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-09-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI