Global Patent Index - EP 1316712 A2

EP 1316712 A2 2003-06-04 - Combustion engine

Title (en)

Combustion engine

Title (de)

Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1316712 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02025025 A

Priority

DE 10159106 A

Abstract (en)

I.C. engine comprises a crank housing (8) fixed to an oil collecting housing, a lubricating oil pump (10) arranged in the oil collecting housing, and a console fixed to the oil collecting housing and/or the crank housing. The transfer of the fluid from the channel integrated in the console to an oil channel integrated in the crank housing takes place via a connecting support provided with a channel. <??>Preferred Features: The connecting support is screwed to the crank housing and has a bearing surface on which an equalization element is axially adjusted.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Brennkraftmaschine mit einem Kurbelgehäuse (8) an dem ein Ölauffanggehäuse (2) befestigt ist, sowie mit einer im Ölauffanggehäuse angeordneten Schmierölpumpe (10), welche das in einem Ölsammelraum des Ölauffanggehäuses befindliche Schmieröl über im Kurbelgehäuse integrierte Ölkanäle (32) zu den Verbrauchern fördert, sowie mit einer am Ölauffanggehäuse und/oder am Kurbelgehäuse befestigten Konsole (25), in der mindestens teilweise fluidführende Kanäle (30) integriert sind und an der verschiedene Baugruppen (26, 28), wie z.B. Ölfilter oder Öl/Wärmetauscher befestigbar sind. Es wird vorgeschlagen, dass der Übertritt des Fluids von dem in der Konsole (24) integrierten Kanal (30) zu dem im Kurbelgehäuse (8) integrierten Ölkanal (32) über einen mit einem Kanal (40) versehenen Verbindungsstutzen (42) erfolgt, der auf einem Stutzen (38) der Konsole (25) radial dichtend und axial auf diesem verschiebbar aufsitzt. Damit können autretende Toleranzen zwischen dem Kanalaustritt aus der Konsole und dem Kanaleintritt in das Kurbelgehäuse wirkungsvoll kompensiert werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02F 7/00; F01M 11/00; F02B 77/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02F 7/00 (2006.01); F01M 1/02 (2006.01); F01M 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02F 7/0051 (2013.01); F01M 2001/0284 (2013.01); F01M 2011/0054 (2013.01); F01M 2011/007 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19741449 A1 19990325 - VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1316712 A2 20030604; EP 1316712 A3 20031105; EP 1316712 B1 20050601; AT 296950 T 20050615; DE 10159106 A1 20030618

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170601

2017-06-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50203255

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151105

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111111

2012-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111111

2012-08-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120731

2012-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111111

2011-04-27 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110331 AND 20110406

2011-04-06 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110310 AND 20110316

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101118

- Year of fee payment: 9

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101124

- Year of fee payment: 9

2011-02-04 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20101130

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-11-27 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2009-07-10 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2006-11-11 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061111

2006-05-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060302

2006-03-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-11-15 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20051115

- Year of fee payment: 4

2005-10-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050912

2005-07-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50203255 P 20050707

2005-06-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

2005-06-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-07-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

2004-07-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040506

2003-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-11-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI