Global Patent Index - EP 1316713 A2

EP 1316713 A2 2003-06-04 - Oil carter for an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Oil carter for an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Ölauffangvorrichtung für eine Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Bac à huile pour un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1316713 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02025026 A

Priority

DE 10159105 A

Abstract (en)

Oil collecting device comprises an oil collecting housing (2) arranged below a crank housing containing a lubricating oil pump (10) fixed to the crank housing. An oil collecting chamber is arranged in the oil collecting housing into which an oil suction line of the lubricating pump to convey the lubricating oil to the consumer unit via the pressure side. Fitting surfaces (34-40) functioning as stops are provided on the housing of the lubricating oil pump and on the oil collecting housing. The oil collecting housing is directed toward the lubricating oil pump via the fitting surfaces. <??>Preferred Features: The housing of the lubricating oil has a support (26) for fixing the oil pump to the crank housing. A console containing an oil filter and/or an oil-water heat exchanger is fixed to the front side of the oil collecting housing.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Ölauffangvorrichtung für eine Brennkraftmaschine mit einem unterhalb eines Kurbelgehäuses (8) angeordneten Ölauffanggehäuse (2), in dem eine Schmierölpumpe (10) angeordnet ist, die am Kurbelgehäuse befestigt ist, wobei im Ölauffanggehäuse (2) mindestens ein Ölsammelraum (12) ausgebildet ist, in den eine Ölabsaugleitung (16) der Schmierölpumpe eingreift und das Schmieröl über die Druckseite zu den Verbrauchern fördert, sowie mit am Ölauffanggehäuse (2) befestigten Baugruppen (46,58). Es wird vorgeschlagen, dass am Gehäuse der Schmierölpumpe (10) und am Ölauffanggehäuse (2) als Anschläge fungierende Passflächen (34 bis 40) vorgesehen sind, über die das Ölauffanggehäuse (2) an der Schmierölpumpe (10) ausgerichtet ist. Durch die am Gehäuse der Ölpumpe (10) und an der Ölwanne (2) vorgesehenen Passflächen ist auf einfache Art und Weise eine entsprechende Ausrichtung der Ölwanne bzw. des Ölführungsgehäuses zur Ölpumpe sichergestellt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02F 7/00; F01M 1/02; F01M 11/00; F02B 77/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01M 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01M 1/02 (2013.01); F01M 2001/0284 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

GB 2127485 A 19840411 - GEN MOTORS CORP

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1316713 A2 20030604; EP 1316713 A3 20040121; EP 1316713 B1 20050817; AT 302338 T 20050915; DE 10159105 A1 20030618

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170601

2017-06-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50203942

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151105

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111111

2012-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111111

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-08-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110801

2011-04-27 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110331 AND 20110406

2011-04-06 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110310 AND 20110316

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101118

- Year of fee payment: 9

2011-02-04 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091201

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-11-27 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081111

2009-07-10 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071122

- Year of fee payment: 6

2006-11-11 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061111

2006-07-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060518

2006-04-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-01-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20051223

2005-11-15 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20051115

- Year of fee payment: 4

2005-09-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50203942 P 20050922

2005-08-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

2005-08-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-10-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

2004-09-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040721

2004-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-01-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-01-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02F 7/00 A

2004-01-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02B 77/00 B

2004-01-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 01M 11/00 B

2004-01-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 01M 1/02 B

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI