Global Patent Index - EP 1316717 A2

EP 1316717 A2 2003-06-04 - Fuel injection system for internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Fuel injection system for internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Kraftstoffeinspritzeinrichtung für eine Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'injection de carburant pour un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1316717 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02022359 A

Priority

DE 10158659 A

Abstract (en)

Fuel injection device comprises a fuel high pressure pump connected to a fuel injection valve (12). In a first switching position, a pump working chamber (22) is connected to a balancing chamber (9) by a first control valve (60), and a pressure chamber (40) and a control pressure chamber (52) are separated by the pump working chamber. In a second switching position, the pump working chamber is separated from the balancing chamber by the first control valve, and the pressure chamber and the control pressure are separated by the pump working chamber. <??>Preferred Features: The first control valve is formed as a 3/2-way valve which can be switched between a first and a second switching position or the first control valve is formed as a 3/3-way valve which can be additionally switched into a third position.

Abstract (de)

Die Kraftstoffeinspritzeinrichtung weist eine Kraftstoffhochdruckpumpe (10) und ein mit dieser verbundenes Kraftstoffeinspritzventil (12) für jeden Zylinder der Brennkraftmaschine auf. Ein Pumpenarbeitsraum (22) der Kraftstoffhochdruckpumpe (10) ist mit einem Druckraum (40) des Kraftstoffeinspritzventils (12) verbindbar, das ein Einspritzventilglied (28) aufweist, das durch den im Druckraum (40) herrschenden Druck gegen eine Schließkraft (44) in einer Öffnungsrichtung (29) bewegbar ist. Durch ein erstes elektrisch betätigtes Steuerventil (60) wird eine Verbindung (59) des Pumpenarbeitsraums (22) mit einem Entlastungsraum (9) gesteuert und durch ein zweites elektrisch betätigtes Steuerventil (68) wird der in einem Steuerdruckraum (52) herrschende Druck gesteuert, durch den das Einspritzventilglied (28) in Schließrichtung beaufschlagt ist. In einer ersten Schaltstellung ist durch das erste Steuerventil (60) der Pumpenarbeitsraum (22) mit dem Entlastungsraum (9) verbunden, während der Druckraum (40) und der Steuerdruckraum (52) vom Pumpenarbeitsraum (22) getrennt sind und in einer zweiten Schaltstellung ist durch das erste Steuerventil (60) der Pumpenarbeitsraum (22) vom Entlastungsraum (9) getrennt, während der Druckraum (40) und der Steuerdruckraum (52) mit dem Pumpenarbeitsraum (22) verbunden sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 47/02; F02M 45/02; F02M 45/12; F02M 57/02; F02M 59/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 55/02 (2006.01); F02M 45/02 (2006.01); F02M 45/04 (2006.01); F02M 47/02 (2006.01); F02M 57/02 (2006.01); F02M 59/36 (2006.01); F02M 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/205 (2013.01); F02M 45/02 (2013.01); F02M 45/04 (2013.01); F02M 47/027 (2013.01); F02M 57/02 (2013.01); F02M 59/366 (2013.01); F02M 63/0007 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0957261 A2 19991117 - LUCAS IND PLC [GB]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1316717 A2 20030604; EP 1316717 A3 20031126; EP 1316717 B1 20050824; DE 10158659 A1 20030612; JP 2003172229 A 20030620; US 2003101968 A1 20030605; US 6808124 B2 20041026

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150501

2015-05-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50204013

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131217

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111102

2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111008

2012-07-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120629

2012-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111008

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101021

- Year of fee payment: 9

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20101109

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-08-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060526

2006-05-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-01-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20051219

2005-09-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50204013 P 20050929

2005-08-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2005-08-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-08-24 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050824

2005-08-24 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050824

2004-11-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040917

2004-08-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-07-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040526

2003-11-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-11-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI