Global Patent Index - EP 1316718 A2

EP 1316718 A2 2003-06-04 - Fuel injection system for internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Fuel injection system for internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Kraftstoffeinspritzeinrichtung für eine Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'injection de carburant pour un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1316718 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02022361 A

Priority

DE 10158660 A

Abstract (en)

Fuel injection device comprises a fuel high pressure pump connected to a fuel injection valve (12). The high pressure pump has a pump piston delimited by a pump working chamber (22). A shut-off valve (62) is arranged in a pressure chamber connection (54) of the pump working chamber with a pressure chamber (40). The pressure chamber and the control pressure chamber are separated by the pump working chamber. The balancing chamber connection of the pump working chamber is connected to a balancing chamber (9) and contains a first control valve (60). <??>Preferred Features: The shut-off valve is formed as a return valve for closing the pump working chamber or an electrically operated control valve which can be switched between an open and a closed position.

Abstract (de)

Die Kraftstoffeinspritzeinrichtung weist eine Kraftstoffhochdruckpumpe (10) und ein mit dieser verbundenes Kraftstoffeinspritzventil (12) für jeden Zylinder der Brennkraftmaschine auf. Ein Pumpenarbeitsraum (22) der Kraftstoffhochdruckpumpe (10) ist mit einem Druckraum (40) des Kraftstoffeinspritzventils (12) verbindbar, das ein Einspritzventilglied (28) aufweist, durch das wenigstens eine Einspritzöffnung (32) gesteuert wird und das durch den im Druckraum (40) herrschenden Druck gegen eine Schließkraft (44) in einer Öffnungsrichtung (29) bewegbar ist. Durch ein erstes elektrisch betätigtes Steuerventil (60) wird eine Verbindung (59) des Pumpenarbeitsraums (22) mit einem Entlastungsraum (9) gesteuert und durch ein zweites elektrisch betätigtes Steuerventil (68) wird der in einem Steuerdruckraum (52) herrschende Druck gesteuert, durch den das Einspritzventilglied (28) in Schließrichtung beaufschlagt ist. In der Druckraumverbindung (54) des Pumpenarbeitsraums (22) mit dem Druckraum (40) ist ein Absperrventil (62) angeordnet, durch das der Druckraum (40) und der Steuerdruckraum (52) vom Pumpenarbeitsraum (22) trennbar sind und die Entlastungsraumverbindung (59) des Pumpenarbeitsraums (22) mit dem Entlastungsraum (9), in der das erste Steuerventil (60) angeordnet ist, führt zwischen dem Pumpenarbeitsraum (22) und dem Absperrventil (62) ab. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 57/02; F02M 45/02; F02M 45/04; F02M 47/02; F02M 59/36; F02M 63/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 55/02 (2006.01); F02M 45/02 (2006.01); F02M 45/04 (2006.01); F02M 47/02 (2006.01); F02M 57/02 (2006.01); F02M 59/36 (2006.01); F02M 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/205 (2013.01); F02M 45/02 (2013.01); F02M 45/04 (2013.01); F02M 47/027 (2013.01); F02M 57/02 (2013.01); F02M 59/366 (2013.01); F02M 63/0007 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0957261 A2 19991117 - LUCAS IND PLC [GB]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1316718 A2 20030604; EP 1316718 A3 20040428; DE 10158660 A1 20030612; JP 2003172228 A 20030620; US 2003131825 A1 20030717; US 6796290 B2 20040928

INPADOC legal status


2006-01-18 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051123

2005-01-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2005-01-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041125

2004-12-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20041028

2004-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-04-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-04-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 57/02 A

2004-04-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 45/02 B

2004-04-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 45/04 B

2004-04-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 47/02 B

2004-04-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 59/36 B

2004-04-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 63/00 B

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI