Global Patent Index - EP 1316719 A2

EP 1316719 A2 2003-06-04 - Injector with a magnetic valve for controlling an injection valve

Title (en)

Injector with a magnetic valve for controlling an injection valve

Title (de)

Injektor mit einem Magnetventil zur Steuerung eines Einspritzventils

Title (fr)

Injecteur comprenant une soupape électromagnétique pour la commande d'une soupape d'injection

Publication

EP 1316719 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02022592 A

Priority

DE 10159003 A

Abstract (en)

Injector comprises a magnetic valve (1) for controlling an injection valve (2). The valve has a movable anchor (3) which can be applied to a valve seat (4) in the lower anchor chamber (5). The anchor chamber is in fluid connection with a control pressure chamber (8) of the injection valve via holes (6, 7). Devices are provided for reducing the pressure fluctuations arising in the lower anchor chamber. <??>Preferred Features: One or more sections of the injection such as the return hole (9) and the lower anchor chamber are formed by recesses. A throttle is formed in the return hole in front of the lower anchor chamber.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Injektor, insbesondere zur Kraftstoffeinspritzung, mit einem Magnetventil (1) zur Steuerung eines Einspritzventils (2), wobei das Magnetventil (1) einen bewegbaren Anker (3) aufweist, der auf einen Ventilsitz (4) im unteren Ankerraum (5) aufbringbar ist. Der untere Ankerraum (5) steht über Bohrungen (6, 7) mit dem Steuerdruckraum (8) des Einspritzventils (2) in Fluidverbindung. Über eine Rücklaufbohrung (9) können auftretende Leckmengen über den unteren Ankerraum (5) in einen Tank zurückgeführt werden. Um beim Schließen des Ventilsitzes (4) durch den Anker (3) ein Ankerprellen zu verhindern, wird vorgeschlagen, in dem Injektor Mittel zur Reduzierung von im unteren Ankerraum (5) auftretenden Druckschwankungen vorzusehen. Die Beseitigung von Druckschwankungen im unteren Ankerraum (5) führt weitestgehend zu einer Beseitigung des Ankerprellens. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 47/02; F02M 55/00; F02M 63/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/16 (2006.01); F02M 45/08 (2006.01); F02M 47/00 (2006.01); F02M 47/02 (2006.01); F02M 55/00 (2006.01); F02M 59/46 (2006.01); F02M 61/20 (2006.01); F02M 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 55/002 (2013.01); F02M 47/027 (2013.01); F02M 63/0017 (2013.01); F02M 63/0036 (2013.01); F02M 2200/304 (2013.01); F02M 2547/003 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1316719 A2 20030604; EP 1316719 A3 20030806; EP 1316719 B1 20080206; DE 10159003 A1 20030618; DE 50211643 D1 20080320; JP 2003172232 A 20030620; JP 3902757 B2 20070411; US 2003150930 A1 20030814; US 6877680 B2 20050412

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171206

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141031

2015-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141009

2015-07-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150630

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20131025

- Year of fee payment: 12

2014-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131018

- Year of fee payment: 12

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121009

2013-06-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121009

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101021

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-01-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20081107

2008-10-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-03-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50211643 P 20080320

2008-02-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2008-02-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-09-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040721

2004-04-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-04-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040206

2003-08-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-08-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-08-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 47/02 A

2003-08-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 55/00 B

2003-08-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 59/46 B

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI