Global Patent Index - EP 1316722 A1

EP 1316722 A1 2003-06-04 - Electronic command circuit for an automotive engine starter

Title (en)

Electronic command circuit for an automotive engine starter

Title (de)

Elektronische Schaltung zur Steuerung eines Startermotors

Title (fr)

Circuit de commande électronique d'un démarreur de véhicule automobile

Publication

EP 1316722 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02292919 A

Priority

FR 0115555 A

Abstract (en)

The vehicle starter motor control circuit includes an electromagnetic contactor (CT) whose coil (L) is controlled by power transistors (T1, T2). The power stage (10) includes a diode (D1) which prevents the flow of current in the reverse direction, in the event of the inversion of polarity of the battery. <??>The electronic control circuit for a vehicle starter motor comprises an electromagnetic contactor (CT) whose coil (L) is excited via an electronic switch with power transistors (T1, T2). A management unit (G) co-operates with the electronic switch in order to control the excitation current through the coil. A free-wheeling diode (D2) is connected in parallel with the terminals of the coil. The power stage (10) includes a diode (D1) which prevents the flow of current in the reverse direction, in the event of the inversion of polarity of the battery. The electronic switch comprises a first transistor (T1) controlled by the management unit, and a second transistor (T2) mounted in series with the first, controlled in all-or-nothing mode by a logic gate (ET) sensitive to the open/closed state of the starter switch (K).

Abstract (fr)

Un circuit de commande électronique d'un démarreur de véhicule automobile, comprend un contacteur (CT) électromagnétique, dont la bobine (L) est excitée par l'intermédiaire d'un commutateur électronique à transistors de puissance (T1, T2). L'étage de puissance (10) est équipé d'un élément semi-conducteur unidirectionnel, notamment une diode (D1), destiné à interdire le passage du courant en cas d'inversion de polarité de la batterie (B). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02N 11/08; F02N 11/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02N 11/08 (2006.01); F02N 11/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02N 11/087 (2013.01); F02N 11/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1316722 A1 20030604; EP 1316722 B1 20070404; DE 60219268 D1 20070516; DE 60219268 T2 20080103; ES 2284799 T3 20071116; FR 2834756 A1 20030718; FR 2834756 B1 20041015

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20171126

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171130

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171116

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-11-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161116

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20161130

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161121

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-11-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-11-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-03-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080107

2007-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2284799 T3

2007-06-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070518

2007-05-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60219268 P 20070516

2007-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2007-04-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-11-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030912

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI