Global Patent Index - EP 1316731 A1

EP 1316731 A1 2003-06-04 - Axial fan and means for reducing noise

Title (en)

Axial fan and means for reducing noise

Title (de)

Axiallüfter und Mittel zur Lärmverminderung

Title (fr)

Ventilateur helicoide avec un moyen réducteur de bruit

Publication

EP 1316731 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02356249 A

Priority

FR 0115680 A

Abstract (en)

The fan consists of a rotor with a hub (2) and a series of blades rotating inside a housing or shell (4) at a distance from its inner surface. The blades are fitted with noise reducers (10) in the form of projections on the inner faces of the blade tips. The outer surface (12) of each projection lies at a tangent to the blade tip, and its inner surface (11) acts as a blocking face for the air flow. The noise reducing projections are of constant cross-section and cover at least half the blades' width while being between 0.5 and 2 times the blades' thickness; they can be made in one piece with the blades, e.g. by injection moulding of plastic or aluminium.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un ventilateur hélicoïde comprenant une roue composée d'une série de pales (1) montées à rotation à l'intérieur et à distance d'au moins une virole (4), chaque pale (1) étant munie d'un moyen réducteur de bruit acoustique (10) au voisinage de la virole (4), caractérisé en ce que les moyens réducteurs de bruit (10) sont disposés du côté intrados (I) des pales (1) et formés par un bourrelet de matière (10A) formant excroissance par rapport à la surface de chaque pale (1) et dont la face extérieure (12) formant le contour vient sensiblement tangenter l'extrémité de chaque pale à sa partie supérieure. Ventilateurs industriels. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 29/38; F04D 29/16; F04D 29/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/16 (2006.01); F04D 29/38 (2006.01); F04D 29/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/384 (2013.01); F04D 29/164 (2013.01); F04D 29/666 (2013.01); F05D 2240/307 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1316731 A1 20030604; FR 2833050 A1 20030606; FR 2833050 B1 20051111; US 2003123987 A1 20030703

INPADOC legal status


2007-10-10 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070216

2006-11-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061005

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-01-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031201

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO