Global Patent Index - EP 1316757 A2

EP 1316757 A2 2003-06-04 - Gas range

Title (en)

Gas range

Title (de)

Gaskochstelle

Title (fr)

Cusinière de gaz

Publication

EP 1316757 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02025565 A

Priority

DE 10159253 A

Abstract (en)

Gas cooking point comprises a gas burner with a safety valve to which an operating toggle (5) is assigned pre-tensioned by a spring in a first position in which the safety valve is closed, and a locking element (31) connected to a movement transfer device (43) which holds the locking element in the first position of the operating toggle. During an adjusting movement of the operating toggle from a first position into a second position, the locking element is brought into a stopping position. <??>Preferred Features: The locking element is formed as a sash lock which the movement transfer device pivots into the second position into the stopping position during the adjusting movement.

Abstract (de)

Es sind Gaskochstellen mit zumindest einem Gasbrenner (1) bekannt, der ein Sicherheitsventil (23) aufweist, dem ein federvorgespannter Bedienknebel (5) zugeordnet ist. Der Bedienknebel (5) ist über ein Teleskopgestänge (3) mit dem Sicherheitsventil (23) verbunden, dessen Teleskopteile (9, 11) mittels eines Riegelelements (31) zueinander längenfixiert werden. Aufgabengemäß soll eine von einem Monteur vorzunehmende Anpassung der Länge des Teleskopgestänges (3) nach der fertigen Montage der Gaskochstelle an einen Einbauabstand (a) zwischen dem Bedienknebel (5) und dem Sicherheitsventil (23) vermieden werden. Dies ist erfindungsgemäß durch ein Bewegungsübertragungsmittel (43) erreicht, das bei einer Druckbetätigung des Bedienknebels (5) das Riegelelement (31) von seiner Freigabeposition (α1) in seine Arretierposition (α2) bringt und bei einem Loslassen des Bedienknebels (5) das Riegelelement (31) in seine Freigabeposition (α1) bringt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 3/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 3/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 3/126 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1316757 A2 20030604; EP 1316757 A3 20060517; DE 10159253 A1 20030618

INPADOC legal status


2010-03-17 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090918

2007-01-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2006-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20061117

2006-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2006-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-01-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI