Global Patent Index - EP 1316758 A2

EP 1316758 A2 2003-06-04 - Attachment clip

Title (en)

Attachment clip

Title (de)

Befestigungsklammer

Title (fr)

Pince de fixation

Publication

EP 1316758 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02079661 A

Priority

SE 0104001 A

Abstract (en)

An attachment clip (1) for suspending a radiator (2) on a suspension device is disposed on one side of the radiator (2). The clip (1) has a transport position where it is disposed adjacent or partly inside the outer contour of the radiator (2), and a mounting position where it projects a distance out from the outer contour of the radiator (2). <??>A method of suspending a radiator (2) provided with an attachment clip comprises the step that the clip (1), prior to suspension, is acted on so as to assume a mounting position from the transport position. The mounting position is suitable for suspension. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24D 19/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24D 19/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24D 19/022 (2013.01); F24D 19/02 (2013.01); F24D 19/0226 (2013.01); F24D 19/023 (2013.01); F24D 19/0263 (2013.01); F24D 2220/2054 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1316758 A2 20030604; EP 1316758 A3 20050615; PL 357430 A1 20030602; SE 0104001 L 20030530; SE 522309 C2 20040203

INPADOC legal status


2006-10-04 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051216

2006-05-04 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2006-03-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2005-06-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2005-06-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI