Global Patent Index - EP 1316760 A1

EP 1316760 A1 2003-06-04 - DECORATIVE PANEL FOR AIR CONDITIONING SYSTEM, AIR OUTLET BLOW-OFF UNIT, AND AIR CONDITIONING SYSTEM

Title (en)

DECORATIVE PANEL FOR AIR CONDITIONING SYSTEM, AIR OUTLET BLOW-OFF UNIT, AND AIR CONDITIONING SYSTEM

Title (de)

ZIERPLATTE FÜR KLIMAANLAGE, ABBLASEINHEIT FÜR LUFTAUSLASS UND KLIMAANLAGE

Title (fr)

PANNEAU DE DECORATION POUR SYSTEME DE CLIMATISATION, UNITE D'ECHAPPEMENT D'AIR DE SORTIE, ET SYSTEME DE CLIMATISATION

Publication

EP 1316760 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01961229 A

Priority

  • JP 0107505 W
  • JP 2000269702 A

Abstract (en)

The configuration of an airconditioner air vent (16) is improved so that horizontal emission by a horizontal vane (18) becomes possible and, at the same time, in order to prevent a ceiling surface (70) from becoming dirty when performing a horizontal emission operation, areas in the vicinity of both lengthwise ends of the air vent (16) are so configured that the direction in which conditioned air is emitted at lengthwise both ends of the air vent (16) is oriented more downwardly than the emission direction at a lengthwise middle portion of the air vent (16). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 1/00; F24F 13/06; F24F 13/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 13/14 (2006.01); F24F 13/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 13/14 (2013.01); F24F 1/0011 (2013.01); F24F 2001/0037 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1316760 A1 20030604; EP 1316760 A4 20040421; EP 1316760 B1 20080102; AU 2001282563 B2 20051013; AU 8256301 A 20020322; CN 1175222 C 20041110; CN 1342873 A 20020403; CN 2509504 Y 20020904; DE 60132218 D1 20080214; DE 60132218 T2 20081218; ES 2296785 T3 20080501; JP 2002081683 A 20020322; JP 3624814 B2 20050302; WO 0221052 A1 20020314

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170822

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170906

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170824

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170714

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170830

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-14 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-12-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20081003

2008-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080102

2008-07-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2296785 T3

2008-02-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60132218 P 20080214

2008-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2008-01-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2004-04-21 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040309

2004-04-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 24F 1/00 A

2004-04-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 24F 13/14 B

2004-04-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 24F 13/06 B

2003-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030312

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI