Global Patent Index - EP 1316762 A2

EP 1316762 A2 2003-06-04 - Continuous flow heater

Title (en)

Continuous flow heater

Title (de)

Durchlauferhitzer

Title (fr)

Chauffe-eau instantané

Publication

EP 1316762 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02024699 A

Priority

DE 20119349 U

Abstract (en)

The through flow heater has a heating device with a connecting head (3) and a connected heating body, which heats a medium flowing past it. A cover housing (5) surrounds the heating body and heating device and the medium to he heated is fed through it. The cover housing is formed as an extruded part, of aluminum. <??>The heating body is formed as a screw-in part which extends between two assembly heads (6,7) of teh throughflow heater (1). The screw-in part is screwed at least with the assembly head adjacent to the connecting head of the heating device.

Abstract (de)

Ein Durchlauferhitzer hat eine Heizvorrichtung (2), die einen Anschlußkopf (3) und einen damit verbundenen Heizkörper (4) aufweist, mittels dem ein an ihm vorbeiströmendes Medium erwärmbar ist, und ein Mantelgehäuse (5), das den Heizkörper (4) der Heizvorrichtung (2) umgibt und durch das hindurch das zu erwärmende Medium führbar ist. Um einen derartigen Durchlauferhitzer mit einem geringeren technisch-konstruktiven und wirtschaftlichen Aufwand herstellen zu können, wobei ein leichterer Aufbau als bei aus dem Stand der Technik bekannten Durchlauferhitzern erreicht werden soll und wobei der Durchlauferhitzer ohne großen Aufwand in unterschiedlichen Abmessungen herstellbar sein soll, wird vorgeschlagen, daß das den Heizkörper (4) der Heizvorrichtung (2) umgebende Mantelgehäuse als Strangziehteil ausgebildet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24H 1/10; F24H 9/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24H 1/10 (2006.01); F24H 9/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24H 9/122 (2013.01); F24H 1/102 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 20119349 U1 20030403; EP 1316762 A2 20030604; EP 1316762 A3 20040121

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-24 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100601

2007-03-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060111

2004-10-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-08-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040618

2004-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-01-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI