Global Patent Index - EP 1316765 A2

EP 1316765 A2 2003-06-04 - Accumulator for an air conditioner, particularly for vehicle air conditioners

Title (en)

Accumulator for an air conditioner, particularly for vehicle air conditioners

Title (de)

Akkumulator für eine Klimaanlage, insbesondere Fahrzeugklimaanlage

Title (fr)

Accumulateur pour système de climatisation, en particulier pour des systèmes de climatisation de véhicule

Publication

EP 1316765 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02022058 A

Priority

DE 10158409 A

Abstract (en)

An insert (5) in a casing has a part that combines as one-piece a first tube (6,19) opening into the interior of the casing in an upper area and a second tube (7a) linking with its bottom end to the first tube's bottom end. Refrigerant from an inlet reaches directly into the casing's interior through a third tube molded on the insert as one piece.

Abstract (de)

Ein Akkumulator für eine nach dem Orifice-Prinzip arbeitende Klimaanlage umfasst in an und für sich bekannter Weise ein Gehäuse (2), das eine Einlassöffnung (3) und eine Auslassöffnung (4) für Kältemittel aufweist. In dem Gehäuse (2) ist ein Einsatz (5) angeordnet, der mindestens ein Teil umfaßt, in dem einstückig ein erstes, sich im oberen Bereich zum Innenraum des Gehäuses (2) zu öffnendes Rohr (6, 19, 22) und ein zweites Rohr (7, 20, 23), das an seinem unteren Ende mit dem unteren Ende des ersten Rohres (6, 19, 22) kommuniziert, zusammengefasst sind. Statt durch ein drittes Rohr wie beim Stande der Technik, welches dort ebenfalls an den Einsatz einstückig angeformt ist, gelangt bei dem erfindungsgemäßen Akkumulator (1) das Kältemittel aus der Einlassöffnung (3) direkt in den Innenraum des Gehäuses (2). Es wird durch eine an den oberen Bereich (5a) des Einsatzes (5) angeformte Barriere (9, 10) daran gehindert, direkt von der Einlassöffnung (3) des Gehäuses (2) zu der oberen Einlassöffnung (17, 18) des ersten Rohres (6, 19, 22) zu strömen. Der so ausgebildetete Akkumulator weist einen geringeren Strömungswiderstand auf und ist leichter herzustellen als derjenige nach dem Stande der Technik. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25B 43/00; B01D 53/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25B 43/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25B 43/006 (2013.01); F25B 43/003 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 1132696 A1 20010912 - HANSA METALLWERKE AG [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR NL PT

EPO simple patent family

DE 10158409 C1 20030430; DE 50209154 D1 20070215; EP 1316765 A2 20030604; EP 1316765 A3 20031015; EP 1316765 B1 20070103

INPADOC legal status


2009-10-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090501

2009-07-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090501

2009-07-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090630

2009-07-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090501

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071205

- Year of fee payment: 6

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071019

- Year of fee payment: 6

2008-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20071029

- Year of fee payment: 6

2007-12-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20071005

2007-07-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-04-14 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070414

2007-02-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50209154 P 20070215

2007-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR NL

2004-09-29 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR NL PT

2004-07-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR NL TR

2004-05-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040313

2003-10-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-10-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI