Global Patent Index - EP 1316768 A1

EP 1316768 A1 2003-06-04 - Process and device for the production of an ultra high purity liquid from a cryogenic liquid feed with lower purity

Title (en)

Process and device for the production of an ultra high purity liquid from a cryogenic liquid feed with lower purity

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung eines hoch reinen tiefkalten Flüssigprodukts aus einer weniger reinen tiefkalten Einsatzflüssigkeit

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour la production d'un liquide ultra pur à partir d'une charge cryogénique en liquide moins pur

Publication

EP 1316768 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02024690 A

Priority

DE 10158330 A

Abstract (en)

In a process to extract an ultra-pure fluid at low temperature from a less pure fluid at cryogenic temperature, a gaseous fraction (10) is drawn from a reservoir (1) and surrendered to a separation column (7). <??>Also claimed is a commensurate assembly in which a first flow (6) of the impure fluid is drawn from a reservoir (1) and fed to a separation column (7). A second flow (2) of impure very cold fluid is also drawn from the tank (1), evaporated (3) under pressure and returned to the tank (1). A gaseous fraction (11) from the upper separation column is liquefied by a condenser-evaporator (9) producing an ultra-pure product (14). A flow of pressurized gas (23, 26) is supplied from an external source to the reservoir (1). Before its introduction to the tank (1) vapor (4) derived from very cold liquid and/or pressurized gas (26) is brought into indirect contact with fluid in the tank (1) in a heat exchanger (5). A liquid fraction (17) is drawn from the lower section of the first separator column (7) and used to cool the condenser-evaporator (9).

Abstract (de)

Das Verfahren und die Vorrichtung dienen zur Herstellung eines hoch reinen tiefkalten Flüssigprodukts aus einer weniger reinen tiefkalten Einsatzflüssigkeit. Ein erster Strom (6) weniger reiner tiefkalter Einsatzflüssigkeit aus einem Speichertank (1) wird in eine erste Trennsäule (7) eingeleitet. Ein zweiter Strom (2) weniger reiner tiefkalter Einsatzflüssigkeit aus dem Speichertank (1) wird in einem Druckaufbauverdampfer (3) verdampft und in den Speichertank (1) zurückgeleitet (4). Eine gasförmige Fraktion (11) aus dem oberen Bereich der ersten Trennsäule (7) wird in einem Kondensator-Verdampfer (9) verflüssigt. Es wird ein hoch reines Flüssigprodukt (14) gewonnen. Eine gasförmige Einsatzfraktion (10) wird aus dem Speichertank (1) entnommen und der ersten Trennsäule (7) zugeleitet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25J 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25J 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25J 3/08 (2013.01); F25J 2200/06 (2013.01); F25J 2210/42 (2013.01); F25J 2215/44 (2013.01); F25J 2220/44 (2013.01); F25J 2250/42 (2013.01); F25J 2290/62 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] EP 0756144 A2 19970129 - TEISAN KK [JP]
  • [DA] US 5421164 A 19950606 - BRUGEROLLE JEAN-RENAUD [FR]
  • [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1995, no. 04 31 May 1995 (1995-05-31)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 016, no. 311 (M - 1277) 8 July 1992 (1992-07-08)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 016, no. 549 (M - 1338) 18 November 1992 (1992-11-18)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 014, no. 460 (M - 1032) 4 October 1990 (1990-10-04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1316768 A1 20030604; DE 10158330 A1 20030618

INPADOC legal status


2009-11-25 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090603

2009-08-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: LINDE AG

2007-11-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: LINDE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031107

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI