Global Patent Index - EP 1316838 A1

EP 1316838 A1 2003-06-04 - Semiconductor optical modulator

Title (en)

Semiconductor optical modulator

Title (de)

Optischer Halbleitermodulator

Title (fr)

Modulateur semiconducteur électro-optique

Publication

EP 1316838 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01310094 A

Priority

EP 01310094 A

Abstract (en)

An electro absorption modulator in which the photocurrent generated by the absorption of light is monitored and the bias voltage applied to the electro absorption modulator is varied in order to vary the photocurrent and thence the extinction ratio of the electro absorption modulator. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G02F 1/01; G02F 1/015

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02F 1/01 (2006.01); G02F 1/015 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G02F 1/0123 (2013.01); G02F 2001/0157 (2013.01); G02F 2201/58 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1316838 A1 20030604; US 2003103255 A1 20030605; US 6717709 B2 20040406

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-09 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20091222

2007-03-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070221

2006-12-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: AVAGO TECHNOLOGIES FIBER IP (SINGAPORE) PTE. LTD.

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031204

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI