Global Patent Index - EP 1316843 A2

EP 1316843 A2 2003-06-04 - Digital bucky device including grid storage

Title (en)

Digital bucky device including grid storage

Title (de)

Digitale Bucky-Vorrichtung mit Rasterlagerung

Title (fr)

Dispositif numérique de Bucky comprenant un entreposage de grille

Publication

EP 1316843 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02258122 A

Priority

  • US 99446901 A
  • US 698601 A

Abstract (en)

A bucky device and method including an X-ray image detector, an anti-scatter grid, a first chamber disposed to house the grid in an active position in which the grid is positioned upstream of the X-ray image detector in respect to x-ray impingement and a second chamber disposed to house the grid in a storage position in which the grid is positioned downstream of the X-ray image detector in respect to x-ray impingement. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03B 42/02; A61B 6/00; G03B 42/04; G21K 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G21K 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G21K 1/025 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1316843 A2 20030604; EP 1316843 A3 20040102

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-09 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1056917

2005-04-20 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040703

2004-10-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-09-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 03B 42/02 A

2004-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 03B 42/04 B

2004-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61B 6/00 B

2004-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 21K 1/02 B

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI