Global Patent Index - EP 1316845 A1

EP 1316845 A1 2003-06-04 - Thermographic recording material with improved developability

Title (en)

Thermographic recording material with improved developability

Title (de)

Thermographisches Aufzeichnungsmaterial mit verbesserter Entwickelbarkeit

Title (fr)

Matériau d'enregistrement thermographique ayant un pouvoir de développement amélioré

Publication

EP 1316845 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 02102623 A

Priority

  • EP 02102623 A
  • EP 01000691 A

Abstract (en)

A black and white thermographic recording material comprising a thermosensitive element and a support, the thermosensitive element containing at least one substantially light-insensitive organic silver salt, a binder and optionally photosensitive silver halide, characterized in that the thermosensitive element further contains deliberately added metal nano-particles in a molar ratio with respect to the total molar concentration of the at least one substantially light-insensitive organic silver salt in the range of 0.05:1 to 10<-6>:1; and the use for the purpose of increasing the ratio of Dmax to the quantity of said substantially light-insensitive organic silver salts per unit area of the above-mentioned thermographic recording material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03C 1/498; B41M 5/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03C 1/498 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03C 1/49845 (2013.01); G03C 1/4989 (2013.01); G03C 1/498 (2013.01); G03C 1/49827 (2013.01); G03C 7/3041 (2013.01); G03C 2001/03588 (2013.01); G03C 2001/03594 (2013.01); G03C 2001/091 (2013.01); G03C 2001/7448 (2013.01); G03C 2200/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1316845 A1 20030604; EP 1316845 B1 20050420

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061122

2007-08-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070731

2007-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061122

2007-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070601

2006-04-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060123

2006-03-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-11-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051125

- Year of fee payment: 4

2005-11-23 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20051123

- Year of fee payment: 4

2005-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60203774 P 20050525

2005-05-18 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2005-04-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-04-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031204

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI