Global Patent Index - EP 1316858 A1

EP 1316858 A1 2003-06-04 - Date mechanism for timepiece

Title (en)

Date mechanism for timepiece

Title (de)

Kalendermechanismus für eine Uhr

Title (fr)

Mecanisme de quantième de pièce d'horlogerie

Publication

EP 1316858 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 01811165 A

Priority

EP 01811165 A

Abstract (en)

The mechanism has a units pinion/indicator (3) with ten or multiple of ten teeth and a tens pinion/indicator (4) with four or a multiple of four teeth. A peg (9) on the units pinion drives the tens pinion through a return pinion (10). An auxiliary pinion (12) engages alternately with the tens pinion and a tens cam (15) to drive the tens pinion one step between 31 and 01 without driving the units pinion

Abstract (fr)

Ce mécanisme de quantième comprend un mobile des unités (1, 3) muni de dix dents ou d'un multiple de dix et un mobile des dizaines (2, 4) muni de quatre dents ou d'un multiple de quatre, une liaison cinématique entre ces mobiles pour déplacer d'un pas le mobile des dizaines tous les dix pas du mobile des unités (1, 3) et un mobile d'entraînement (7, 8) du mobile des unités (1, 3). Une dent du mobile des unités (1, 3) pour le passage de "1" à "2" est une dent d'un mobile auxiliaire (12) solidaire du mobile des unités (1, 3) et qui est susceptible de venir en prise alternativement avec la denture du mobile indicateur des dizaines (2, 4) et avec une came (15) solidaire du mobile des dizaines (2, 4) et destinée à permettre au mobile auxiliaire (12) d'entraîner ledit mobile des dizaines (4) d'un pas entre le "31" et le "01" sans entraîner le mobile des unités (1, 3). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04B 19/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04B 19/253 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04B 19/25366 (2013.01); G04B 19/2536 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1316858 A1 20030604; EP 1316858 B1 20080123; DE 01811165 T1 20040311; DE 60132602 D1 20080313; DE 60132602 T2 20080828; HK 1053172 A1 20080328; JP 2003167068 A 20030613; JP 4242634 B2 20090325; US 2003103416 A1 20030605; US 6738316 B2 20040518

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20161121

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-12-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: ROLEX SA, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ROLEX SA, CH

2016-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151130

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151130

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160601

2016-08-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160729

2016-07-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20151130

2016-06-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60132602

2015-02-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141201

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20141118

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141113

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-12-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20081024

2008-03-28 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1053172

2008-03-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20080227

2008-03-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60132602 P 20080313

2008-02-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: MOINAS & SAVOYE SA

2008-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2008-01-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2008-01-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-11 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2003-11-05 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

2003-09-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030710

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI