Global Patent Index - EP 1316859 A1

EP 1316859 A1 2003-06-04 - Method for forming a date mechanism operated by a clockwork

Title (en)

Method for forming a date mechanism operated by a clockwork

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Kalendermechanismus für eine Uhr

Title (fr)

Procédé pour former un mécanisme de quantième actionnné par un mouvement d'horlogerie

Publication

EP 1316859 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 01811166 A

Priority

EP 01811166 A

Abstract (en)

The basic mechanism used consists of a driving tooth (8), units pinion/indicator (3), tens pinion/indicator (4), return pinion (10) and auxiliary pinion (12). To this is added an annual pinion (18) which selectively engages with the driving tooth only when passing from 30 to01 and with the tens pinion only when the latter is passing from 2 to 3 and from 3 to 0.

Abstract (fr)

Selon ce procédé on place les chiffres des unités et des dizaines sur deux mobiles indicateurs respectifs (1, 2). On forme deux chaînes cinématiques, une chaîne quotidienne entre le mouvement d'horlogerie et les mobiles indicateurs, pour déplacer sélectivement pas à pas le mobile indicateur des unités (1) d'un pas toutes les 24 heures, le mobile indicateur des dizaines (2) d'un pas tous les dix pas du mobile indicateur des unités (1), pour passer d'une dizaine à l'autre et l'indicateur des dizaines d'un pas pour passer du "31" au "01" selon un cycle de 31 jours, une chaîne cinématique annuelle entre le mouvement d'horlogerie et le mobile indicateur des dizaines, programmée pour déplacer le mobile indicateur des dizaines (2) d'un pas simultanément au déplacement du mobile indicateur des unités (1) par la chaîne cinématique quotidienne, pour passer du "30" au "01" à la fin des mois de moins de trente et un jours. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04B 19/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04B 19/253 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04B 19/2536 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1316859 A1 20030604; EP 1316859 B1 20100127; DE 01811166 T1 20040311; DE 60141212 D1 20100318; HK 1053359 A1 20100416; JP 2003194967 A 20030709; JP 4242635 B2 20090325; US 2003103417 A1 20030605; US 6958952 B2 20051025

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20171122

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171121

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171130

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171116

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-11-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-12-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: ROLEX SA, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ROLEX SA, CH

2016-11-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-11-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-01-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20101028

2010-04-16 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1053359

2010-03-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60141212 P 20100318

2010-01-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2010-01-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: MOINAS & SAVOYE SA

2010-01-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2010-01-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071218

2004-03-11 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2003-11-05 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

2003-09-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030710

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI