Global Patent Index - EP 1316862 A2

EP 1316862 A2 2003-06-04 - Electro-mechanical time switch

Title (en)

Electro-mechanical time switch

Title (de)

Elektromechanische Schaltuhr

Title (fr)

Commutateur horaire électro-mécanique

Publication

EP 1316862 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02026601 A

Priority

DE 10159010 A

Abstract (en)

Electromagnetic timer has a drive (10), a gear (12- 14), an electronic control, a sensor (20) and programmable switching disk (15). A switching element (16) on the circumference of the disk is sampled by a switching lever (17) and whereby the sensor produces sensor signal corresponding to a rotational movement. The signal produced by the sensor is acquired by a sensor counter. The invention also relates to a corresponding method for quick setting of an electromagnetic timer.

Electromagnetic timer has a drive (10), a gear (12- 14), an electronic control, a sensor (20) and programmable switching disk (15). A switching element (16) on the circumference of the disk is sampled by a switching lever (17) and whereby the sensor produces sensor signal corresponding to a rotational movement. The signal produced by the sensor is acquired by a sensor counter. <??>The invention also relates to a corresponding method for quick setting of an electromagnetic timer.

Abstract (de)

Elektromechanische Schaltuhr umfassend einen Antrieb (10), ein Getriebe (12, 13, 14,) eine elektronischen Steuerung, einen Sensor (20, 21) und eine von dem Antrieb (10) antreibbare und um ihre Achse drehbare Programmschaltscheibe (15) mit an ihrem Umfang angeordneten Schaltelementen (16), welche in mindestens zwei Stellungen einstellbar sind, die einem Einschaltzustand bzw. einem Ausschaltzustand entsprechen, wobei die jeweiligen Stellungen der Schaltelemente (16) am Umfang der Programmschaltscheibe (15) von einem Schalthebel (17) abgetastet werden, welcher gelenkig gelagert ist, und wobei der Sensor ein einer Drehbewegung entsprechendes Sensorsignal erzeugt, dass der Sensor (20, 21) zur Erzeugung des Sensorsignals die Drehbewegung des Antriebs (10) oder eines mit dem Antrieb (10) gekoppelten Getriebeteils erfasst, dass die Steuerung einen Sensorzähler (31) umfasst, dass das Sensorsignal dem Sensorzähler (31) zugeführt ist und dass der Sensorzähler (31) die Abschaltung des Antriebs (10) bewirkt, sobald der Sensorzähler (31) einen Wert erreicht hat, der in Abhängigkeit vom Betriebszustand der Schaltuhr einem Antriebszyklus (Schritt) oder mehreren Antriebszyklen (Schritten) entspricht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04C 23/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04C 23/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04C 23/12 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1316862 A2 20030604; EP 1316862 A3 20070606; EP 1316862 B1 20140416; DE 10159010 A1 20030626; DE 10159010 B4 20111110

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171122

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171121

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171130

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-11-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-11-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-11-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141128

2015-07-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141128

2015-04-30 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 50215915

- Effective date: 20150119

2015-03-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20150119

2015-01-19 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 50215915

2014-11-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20140416

2014-05-22 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 50215915

- Effective date: 20140522

2014-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2014-04-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2013-11-27 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20131029

2011-10-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: LEGRAND GMBH

2010-02-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100118

2008-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2008-01-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20071206

2007-06-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2007-06-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2006-01-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: LEGRAND-BTICINO GMBH

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI