Global Patent Index - EP 1316872 A2

EP 1316872 A2 2003-06-04 - Linkage unit for drive members of self-propelled vehicles such as lift trucks and the like

Title (en)

Linkage unit for drive members of self-propelled vehicles such as lift trucks and the like

Title (de)

Verbindungsvorrichtung für Steuerelemente von Kraftfahrzeugen wie Gabelstapler

Title (fr)

Eléments de liaison pour commandes de véhicules automobiles tels que chariots élévateurs

Publication

EP 1316872 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02080013 A

Priority

IT RE20010115 A

Abstract (en)

A linkage unit for drive members of self-propelled vehicles, such as manual lever or pedal actuators for the forward travel and reversing of a self-propelled vehicle, comprising two linkage members (7) to be connected to said forward travel and reversing actuators, said members being keyed onto two parallel shafts (33a, 33b) and being linked in such a manner as to rotate in phase opposition between a rest position determined by an elastic repositioning device, and two opposing operative positions determined by the activation of one or the other of said actuators, in which said linkage members and said repositioning device are located within an enclosing casing (10, 100, 101, 120) acting as a frame to be removably fixed to the structure of the self-propelled vehicle, and from which said shafts emerge with means (133) for the quick connection of said actuators, said linkage members being connected together by a connecting rod (77). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G05G 1/14; G05G 1/24; G05G 5/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G05G 1/01 (2008.04)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G05G 1/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1316872 A2 20030604; EP 1316872 A3 20030813; EP 1316872 B1 20041110; DE 60201875 D1 20041216; DE 60201875 T2 20050310; IT RE20010115 A1 20030530

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171129

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171127

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-11-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-11-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141128

2015-11-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20131127

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-11-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050811

2005-07-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-12-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60201875 P 20041216

2004-12-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-11-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2004-05-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2004-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031203

2003-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-08-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI