Global Patent Index - EP 1316882 A2

EP 1316882 A2 2003-06-04 - System and method for emulating code

Title (en)

System and method for emulating code

Title (de)

System und Verfahren zur Emulierung von Kodes

Title (fr)

Système et méthode pour émulation de code

Publication

EP 1316882 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02257594 A

Priority

  • US 33423401 P
  • US 10087402 A

Abstract (en)

Systems and methods for integrating emulated and native code are provided. One embodiment comprises a method for emulating code from an original computer system on a host computer system. Briefly described, one such embodiment comprises the steps of: fetching (200) a program instruction associated with program code to be emulated on a host computer system; determining (202) whether the program instruction is to be executed natively on the host computer system or is to be emulated on the host computer system; and if the program instruction is to be executed natively on the host computer system, emitting (206) a native code fragment associated with the program instruction into a dynamic execution layer interface (104) to be executed. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 9/455

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 9/40 (2006.01); G06F 9/45 (2006.01); G06F 9/455 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 9/45504 (2013.01); G06F 9/4484 (2018.02)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1316882 A2 20030604; EP 1316882 A3 20050914; JP 2003196107 A 20030711; US 2003101334 A1 20030529; US 6907519 B2 20050614

INPADOC legal status


2006-12-06 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060315

2006-07-06 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2006-05-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2005-09-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2005-09-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI