Global Patent Index - EP 1316899 A2

EP 1316899 A2 2003-06-04 - Information storage input system, information storage input service and screen display system

Title (en)

Information storage input system, information storage input service and screen display system

Title (de)

Eingabesystem und Eingabedienst zur Informationsspeicherung, und Bildschirmanzeigesystem

Title (fr)

Système et service de saisie pour le stockage d'informations, et système d'affichage sur écran

Publication

EP 1316899 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02026452 A

Priority

JP 2001360639 A

Abstract (en)

An information storage input system for storing predetermined storage data in a storage server on a network accessible from a communication device open to public, includes a plurality of remote input terminal for inputting supplied input data in a predetermined input form, a remote input server for receiving input data from the remote input terminal, and a mobile communication terminal for communicating with at least the remote input server. Here, at least when the input data is stored in the storage server as the storage data, the remote input server notifies the fact to the mobile communication terminal. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 12/00 (2006.01); G06F 13/00 (2006.01); G06F 17/30 (2006.01); H04B 7/26 (2006.01); H04N 1/21 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 17/3089 (2013.01); H04N 1/2179 (2013.01); H04N 2201/0081 (2013.01); H04N 2201/0082 (2013.01); H04N 2201/0086 (2013.01); H04N 2201/0087 (2013.01); H04N 2201/0093 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI GB NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1316899 A2 20030604; EP 1316899 A3 20040225; JP 2003162469 A 20030606; US 2003217103 A1 20031120

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-03 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050127

2004-11-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FI GB NL SE

2004-11-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040916

2004-09-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040629

2004-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-08-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: YAMAMOTO, HIROSHI

2003-08-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: YAMAGUCHI, HIROSHI

2003-08-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SHIOIRI, KATSUO

2003-08-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HARADA, HIROFUMI

2003-08-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HIGASHI, KEISHI

2003-08-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SATO, MITSUYA

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI