Global Patent Index - EP 1316934 A2

EP 1316934 A2 2003-06-04 - Distress Alert

Title (en)

Distress Alert

Title (de)

Notfallalarm

Title (fr)

Alerte de détresse

Publication

EP 1316934 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02258227 A

Priority

GB 0128775 A

Abstract (en)

A distress condition is indicated by transmission of a signal from a portable transmitting or receiving device (10) such as a mobile telephone. A receiving station (12) receives the signal and identifies from the signal the nature of the distress condition and its location. The receiving station then automatically notifies the relevant authorities of the distress condition and its location and they can react accordingly. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 25/01

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08B 21/02 (2006.01); G08B 25/01 (2006.01); G08B 25/08 (2006.01); G08B 25/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 21/0283 (2013.01); G08B 25/016 (2013.01); G08B 25/08 (2013.01); G08B 25/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1316934 A2 20030604; EP 1316934 A3 20030903; EP 1316934 A9 20031203; GB 0128775 D0 20020123

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-01 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040304

2004-07-01 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-05-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-09-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MASON, DEBBIE

2003-09-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: FLETCHER, GRAHAM HOWDEN

2003-09-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MASON, DEBBIE

2003-09-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FLETCHER, GRAHAM HOWDEN

2003-09-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-09-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI