Global Patent Index - EP 1316942 A2

EP 1316942 A2 2003-06-04 - Ultrasonic sensor unit and manufacturing method

Title (en)

Ultrasonic sensor unit and manufacturing method

Title (de)

Ultraschallsensoreinheit und Verfahren zur Herstellung

Title (fr)

Unité de détecteur ultrason et procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 1316942 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02022488 A

Priority

DE 10159679 A

Abstract (en)

Ultrasonic sensor unit (41) has a cup shaped and at least partially vibrating membrane with a housing surrounding the membrane. According to the invention, membrane and housing are formed from a single housing-membrane unit (43) of the same metallic material. The invention also relates to a method for manufacturing such an ultrasonic sensor unit using a deep drawing process followed by a machining process.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Ultraschallsensoreinheit (41) mit einer topfförmigen und wenigstens abschnittsweisen schwingungsfähigen Membrane und mit einem die Membrane wenigstens abschnittsweise umgebenden Gehäuse. Die Erfindung kennzeichnet sich dadurch, dass die Membrane und das Gehäuse als einteiliges, aus dem gleichen metallischen Material hergestelltes Membrane-Gehäuse-Teil (43) ausgebildet ist.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10K 9/122

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10K 9/122 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10K 9/122 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1316942 A2 20030604; EP 1316942 A3 20080507; DE 10159679 A1 20030612

INPADOC legal status


2009-07-16 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2009-06-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20081108

2009-01-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2008-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2008-05-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2006-02-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KUPFERNAGEL, UWE

2006-02-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GOTZIG, HEINRICH

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI