Global Patent Index - EP 1316969 A1

EP 1316969 A1 2003-06-04 - A binderless storage phosphor screen having voids filled up to a defined extent

Title (en)

A binderless storage phosphor screen having voids filled up to a defined extent

Title (de)

Binderfreier Speicherleuchtschirm mit bis zum bestimmten Grade gefüllten Hohlräumen

Title (fr)

Ecran d'enregistrement luminescent sans liant avec des vides remplis jusqu'à un certain degré

Publication

EP 1316969 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01000694 A

Priority

EP 01000694 A

Abstract (en)

A binderless stimulable phosphor screen comprising a vapour deposited storage phosphor layer on a support and a protective layer wherein the vapour deposited phosphor is needle shaped and the phosphor needles have a length, L and voids between them and wherein said protective layer fills said voids for at most 0.10 times L. Preferably the protective layer is radiation cured.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G21K 4/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C09K 11/00 (2006.01); C09K 11/08 (2006.01); C09K 11/61 (2006.01); G01T 1/00 (2006.01); G21K 4/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G21K 4/00 (2013.01); G21K 2004/06 (2013.01); G21K 2004/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1316969 A1 20030604; EP 1316969 B1 20100623; DE 60142438 D1 20100805; JP 2003232899 A 20030822

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151231

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151203

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160701

2016-09-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160831

2016-08-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20151203

2016-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60142438

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140923

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20141007

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140922

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-07-14 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 60142438

- Effective date: 20110323

2011-06-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110324

2010-08-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60142438 P 20100805

2010-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2008-04-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGFA HEALTHCARE NV

2007-04-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGFA HEALTHCARE NV

2007-04-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061220

2007-01-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061220

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031204

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI