Global Patent Index - EP 1316984 A2

EP 1316984 A2 2003-06-04 - Magnetron apparatus

Title (en)

Magnetron apparatus

Title (de)

Magnetrongerät

Title (fr)

Appareil magnétron

Publication

EP 1316984 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02257727 A

Priority

JP 2001344170 A

Abstract (en)

In a magnetron apparatus in accordance with the present invention, a first notch 17, a second notch 19 and a third notch 20 are formed in each of anode segments 15 disposed radially inside an anode cylinder 6, whereby the passage of high-frequency current flowing through the resonator comprising the two anode segments 15 adjacent to each other, the anode cylinder 6 and strap rings 9 and 10 is made narrow and long. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 23/02; H01J 25/587; H03B 9/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 23/20 (2006.01); H01J 23/15 (2006.01); H01J 23/213 (2006.01); H01J 23/22 (2006.01); H01J 25/587 (2006.01); H03B 9/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H03B 9/10 (2013.01); H01J 23/213 (2013.01); H01J 23/22 (2013.01); H01J 25/587 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1316984 A2 20030604; EP 1316984 A3 20040303; EP 1316984 B1 20070627; CN 1251275 C 20060412; CN 1417834 A 20030514; DE 60220874 D1 20070809; DE 60220874 T2 20080313; JP 2003151451 A 20030523; JP 4006980 B2 20071114; KR 100498564 B1 20050701; KR 20030038459 A 20030516; US 2003090220 A1 20030515; US 6670762 B2 20031230

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151130

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151107

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160601

2016-08-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160729

2016-07-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20151107

2016-06-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60220874

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141105

- Year of fee payment: 13

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20141105

- Year of fee payment: 13

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141110

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-06-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080328

2007-10-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-08-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60220874 P 20070809

2007-06-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2007-06-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-11-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-09-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040802

2004-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-03-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021206

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI