Global Patent Index - EP 1317019 A2

EP 1317019 A2 2003-06-04 - Electrical contact element

Title (en)

Electrical contact element

Title (de)

Elektrisches Kontaktelement

Title (fr)

Element de contact électrique

Publication

EP 1317019 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02025355 A

Priority

DE 20119530 U

Abstract (en)

The electrical connector has a plug section (2) to which the wires of a cable are coupled using a sleeve (7). The sleeve is formed with an end section having arms (10) that latch onto serrations (5). The other end has a number of arms (9) that fit into the plug and are pressed against the wires (6).

Abstract (de)

Für den Einsatz in bereits bekannte Steckverbindungen wird ein elektrisches Kontaktelement vorgeschlagen, das als Buchsenkontakt oder als Stiftkontakt ausgebildet sein kann und mit einem Steckbereich und einem Anschlussende versehen ist, wobei auf das Anschlussende des Kontaktelementes eine Hülse aufschraubbar ist. Die Hülse weist nach innen gerichtete Federarme auf, die in eine konische Bohrung im Anschlussende eintauchen. Zwischen diesen Federarmen wird ein elektrischer Leiter positioniert, wobei die Federarmspitzen auf den elektrischen Leiter eine kraftschlüssige Keilwirkung ausüben, um so größer, je weiter die Hülse auf dem Anschlussende verschraubt wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 4/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/48 (2006.01); H01R 4/50 (2006.01); H01R 4/52 (2006.01); H01R 4/56 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 24/28 (2013.01); H01R 4/4818 (2013.01); H01R 4/489 (2013.01); H01R 4/5025 (2013.01); H01R 2101/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 20119530 U1 20020418; AT 365384 T 20070715; DE 50210342 D1 20070802; EP 1317019 A2 20030604; EP 1317019 A3 20040204; EP 1317019 B1 20070620; ES 2289040 T3 20080201; JP 2003168498 A 20030613; JP 3899310 B2 20070328; US 2003104732 A1 20030605; US 6827613 B2 20041207

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180131

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171127

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-11-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-10-14 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-10-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-05-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121115

2014-05-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140527

2013-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121114

2013-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121114

2013-07-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121114

2013-07-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121114

2013-07-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 365384 T

- Effective date: 20121114

2012-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20111124

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101120

- Year of fee payment: 9

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101213

- Year of fee payment: 9

2011-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20101122

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-05-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080325

2008-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2289040 T3

2007-11-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-10-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070926

2007-08-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50210342 P 20070802

2007-06-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

2007-06-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-10-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

2004-09-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040702

2004-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI