Global Patent Index - EP 1317022 A1

EP 1317022 A1 2003-06-04 - Electrical socket with independent movable covers, especially for electrical rasors

Title (en)

Electrical socket with independent movable covers, especially for electrical rasors

Title (de)

Elektrische Buchse mit unabhängigen beweglichen Deckelteilen, speziell für elektrische Rasierer

Title (fr)

Prise de courant à volets escamotables indépendants, notamment pour rasoirs électriques

Publication

EP 1317022 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02292861 A

Priority

FR 0115258 A

Abstract (en)

The electrical plug has an isolating body with a forward section (12) and a rear section (13). There are three holes, each with an isolating material retractable shutter (20), and activated by a pin. There are flexible return sections (30) for each of the shutters separately. There is a slab section (42) with cavity and flexible strip (38) with holes (49) allowing separation pin entry.

Abstract (fr)

La prise comporte une partie avant (12) avec trois trous de passage de broches, et une partie arrière (13) avec trois pièces respectivement situées en regard des trous, propres chacune à recevoir une broche et formant les bornes d'un seul et même circuit bi-tension, l'une d'entre elles constituant une borne commune aux deux valeurs de tension. La prise est caractérisée par un volet escamotable (20, 20', 20") associé à chaque trou et conçu pour pouvoir être actionné par une broche pour passer d'une position de fermeture, dans laquelle il recouvre le trou, à une position d'ouverture lorsqu'une fiche est introduite dans la prise, et des moyens (30) élastiques de rappel sollicitant chaque volet (20, 20', 20") en direction de sa position de fermeture, les volets (20, 20', 20") étant indépendants les uns des autres en sorte qu'une pièce inutilisée reste protégée par un volet (20, 20', 20") occupant sa position de fermeture. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/453; H01R 13/66; H01R 13/703

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/453 (2006.01); H01R 13/66 (2006.01); H01R 13/703 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/7036 (2013.01); H01R 13/4534 (2013.01); H01R 13/6633 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1317022 A1 20030604; EP 1317022 B1 20060201; AT 317159 T 20060215; CN 100466390 C 20090304; CN 1421960 A 20030604; DE 60208988 D1 20060413; DE 60208988 T2 20060817; ES 2253504 T3 20060601; FR 2832864 A1 20030530; FR 2832864 B1 20070119

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141119

2016-05-06 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160506

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141118

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141118

2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150602

2015-07-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141118

2015-06-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60208988

2014-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20131017

- Year of fee payment: 12

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20131118

- Year of fee payment: 12

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131106

- Year of fee payment: 12

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131121

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091118

2009-02-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20081124

- Year of fee payment: 7

2007-01-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061103

2006-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2253504 T3

2006-05-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060413

2006-04-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60208988 P 20060413

2006-02-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES GB IT

2006-02-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-02-01 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060201

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES GB IT

2004-02-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031223

2003-11-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031001

2003-08-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: JUVING, FRANK

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI