Global Patent Index - EP 1317029 A1

EP 1317029 A1 2003-06-04 - Plug

Title (en)

Plug

Title (de)

Stecker

Title (fr)

Fiche

Publication

EP 1317029 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01128536 A

Priority

EP 01128536 A

Abstract (en)

A versatile plug (1) is provided, which has the advantages of preventing signal and ground wires in pairs (5, 7) from being connected in reversed polarity; preventing short circuits occurring in adjacent lead wires; facilitating the connecting operation of the lead wire; and allowing connection of lead wires of different types. The plug (1) comprises: a pair of plug-side contact terminals (25) adapted to be contacted by a pair of apparatus-side terminals (131); a plug housing (15) having an asymmetrical profile in conformity with a configuration of an apparatus-side connection recess (139); and clamp means (33, 39) detachably attached to each of the lead wires (5, 7). Simply by inserting the plug (1) into the connection recess (139), the paired lead wires (5, 7) can be electrically connected to the corresponding paired apparatus-side terminals (131). Since the plug housing (15) has an asymmetrical configuration (143), no reversed polarity connection occurs. A lead wire (5, 7) of any given thickness can be connected to the plug-side contact terminal (25) by the clamping means (33, 39). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 24/06; H01R 4/48; H01R 4/50; H01R 13/64

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 24/06 (2006.01); H01R 4/48 (2006.01); H01R 4/50 (2006.01); H01R 13/64 (2006.01); H01R 24/00 (2006.01); H02G 15/02 (2006.01); H01R 107/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/4845 (2013.01); H01R 4/4872 (2013.01); H01R 4/489 (2013.01); H01R 4/5008 (2013.01); H01R 13/64 (2013.01); H01R 24/20 (2013.01); H01R 2103/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1317029 A1 20030604; EP 1317029 B1 20080730; DE 60135131 D1 20080911

INPADOC legal status


2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091129

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100601

2010-10-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-08-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100730

2010-07-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091129

2010-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SMK CORP.

- Effective date: 20091130

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081224

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-07-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090119

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-07-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090506

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081031

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090129

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-09-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60135131 P 20080911

2008-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2008-07-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-12-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01R 24/06 20060101AFI20071112BHEP

2007-12-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01R 13/64 20060101ALI20071112BHEP

2007-12-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01R 4/48 20060101ALI20071112BHEP

2007-12-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01R 4/50 20060101ALI20071112BHEP

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2003-10-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030825

2003-09-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030717

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI