Global Patent Index - EP 1317031 A1

EP 1317031 A1 2003-06-04 - Manipulator for wire conductors, apparatus and inserting method comprising such a manipulator

Title (en)

Manipulator for wire conductors, apparatus and inserting method comprising such a manipulator

Title (de)

Handhabungsvorrichtung für Drahtleitung, Einführungsmaschine und Einführungsverfahren mit einer solchen Handhabungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Manipulateur de fil conducteur, machine et procédé d'insertion incorporant un tel manipulateur

Publication

EP 1317031 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02023328 A

Priority

  • EP 02023328 A
  • EP 01811057 A

Abstract (en)

The manipulator has a body mounted with a movable clamp (16) having, a pair of arms each equipped with a clamping jaw (12,13) for holding a wire adjacent an extremity of the wire. The manipulator also has a piezoelectric sensor mounted on the clamping to sense an insertion force exerted while inserting the extremity of the wire into an alveolus (5) of a connector.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung bezieht sich auf eine Handhabungsvorrichtung (16) für einen Draht (3, 4), die einen Körper (20) und ein Draht-Halteorgan (14, 15, 28, 29), das in bezug auf den Körper beweglich angebracht ist, umfaßt, dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß das Draht-Halteorgan einen Sensor (34) aufweist, der für eine durch dieses Organ ausgeübte Kraft empfindlich ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 43/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 43/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 43/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1317031 A1 20030604; EP 1317031 B1 20110105

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171023

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20171019

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171024

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171019

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-10-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-10-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-10-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111018

2012-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111018

2012-02-02 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 50214847

- Effective date: 20111006

2011-12-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20111006

2011-02-17 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 50214847

- Effective date: 20110217

2011-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50214847 P 20110217

2011-02-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: INVENTIO AG

2011-01-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2011-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2011-01-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-07-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080617

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2004-01-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031114

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI