Global Patent Index - EP 1317096 A2

EP 1317096 A2 2003-06-04 - Method for determining a symmetric key over an insecure channel and for digitally signing a message transmitted between a first and a second device

Title (en)

Method for determining a symmetric key over an insecure channel and for digitally signing a message transmitted between a first and a second device

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Bestimmung eines symmetrischen Schlüssels über einen unsicheren Kanal und zur digitalen Signatur bei der Übermittlung einer Nachricht zwischen einer ersten und einer zweiten Vorrichtung

Title (fr)

Procédé de détermination d'une clé symétrique sur un canal non sécurisé et de signature numérique lors de la transmission d'un message entre un premier et un second dispositif

Publication

EP 1317096 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02026598 A

Priority

DE 10159690 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves at least one communicating device forming irreducible polynomials and sending to the other device, forming a companion matrix to both polynomials, generating natural numbers as private keys, exponentiating the companion matrices with the keys, one or both devices sending the product of the results to the other and multiplying the received product with its own companion matrices to give the symmetrical key or digital signature. <??>The method involves at least one of the communicating devices forming at least two irreducible polynomials with a randomized or deterministic algorithm and sending them to the other device, forming the companion matrix to both polynomials, generating at least two natural numbers as private keys in each device, exponentiating the companion matrices with the keys in both devices, one or both devices sending the product of the results to the other and one or both devices multiplying the received product with its own companion matrices to give the symmetrical key or digital signature.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Verfahren zur Bestimmung eines symmetrischen Schlüssels über einen unsicheren Kanal und zur digitalen Signatur bei der Übermittlung einer Nachricht zwischen einer ersten und einer zweiten Vorrichtung vorgeschlagen, bei dem die Produkte von Potenzen nicht kommutierender Matrizen gebildet werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04L 9/08; H04L 9/30; H04L 9/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04L 9/08 (2006.01); H04L 9/30 (2006.01); H04L 9/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 9/3013 (2013.01); H04L 9/08 (2013.01); H04L 9/3247 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1317096 A2 20030604; EP 1317096 A3 20031008; DE 10159690 A1 20030618; DE 10159690 C2 20030925

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050920

2004-06-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-04-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040225

2004-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031024

2003-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-10-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI