Global Patent Index - EP 1317106 A3

EP 1317106 A3 2003-06-11 - Method and apparatus for data scrambling/descrambling

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for data scrambling/descrambling

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Datenverschlüsselung und -entschlüsselung

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil d'embrouillage et de désembrouillage de données

Publication

EP 1317106 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 02102640 A

Priority

US 99763901 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1317106A2] A modulated symbol domain data scrambling/descrambling method overcomes modulated signal non-uniform distribution problem associated with higher order M-ary QAM and M-ary PSK modulation. Since the descrambling is performed in the symbol domain, it has the flexibility to place the descrambler outside and before the QAM demapper. By doing so, it is not necessary for QAM demapper or the blocks after QAM demapper to have the knowledge of the scrambling code. The scrambling technique is also backward compatible with most of the current CDMA standards, such as IS 95 and IS-2000 standards. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04L 25/03; H04L 27/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04L 25/03 (2006.01); H04L 27/34 (2006.01); H04B 1/707 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 25/03866 (2013.01); H04L 27/34 (2013.01); H04B 1/707 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1317106 A2 20030604; EP 1317106 A3 20030611; US 2003099359 A1 20030529

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-03 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20170801

2017-02-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20170119

2004-03-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031211

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04L 25/03 A

2003-06-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04L 27/34 B

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI