Global Patent Index - EP 1317177 A1

EP 1317177 A1 2003-06-11 - PESTICIDAL FORMULATIONS

Title (en)

PESTICIDAL FORMULATIONS

Title (de)

PESTIZIDE FORMULIERUNGEN

Title (fr)

FORMULATIONS PESTICIDES

Publication

EP 1317177 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01958248 A

Priority

  • GB 0103742 W
  • GB 0021786 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0219821A1] Aqueous pesticidal suspensions comprise: (a) 5 to 40 % w/v of (i) a pesticide having a melting point in the range of from 50 to 120 DEG C and a solubility in water of not more than 0.2 % w/v or (ii) a mixture of the pesticide (i) and one or more other pesticides having a melting point of at least 50 DEG C and a solubility in water of not more than 0.2 % w/v in the ratio of at least 1 part by weight of the pesticide (i) to 10 parts by weight of the other pesticide or pesticides, (b) 2.5 to 20 % w/v of a non-ionic alkoxylate surfactant, (c) 0.5 to 5 % w/v of a naphtalene sulphonate-formaldehyde condensate, (d) 0.1 to 5 % w/v of a non-ionic polymethyl methacrylate-polyethylene oxide graft copolymer, (e) 0 to 25 % w/v of other additives, and (f) water in sufficient amount to bring the total composition to 100 % w/v. Pesticidal suspensions formulated in this way show less variation in viscosity than hitherto.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A01N 25/30; A01N 37/50; A01N 43/40; A01N 43/54

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01N 25/04 (2006.01); A01N 25/30 (2006.01); A01N 37/06 (2006.01); A01N 37/34 (2006.01); A01N 37/50 (2006.01); A01N 43/40 (2006.01); A01N 43/42 (2006.01); A01N 43/54 (2006.01); A01N 43/653 (2006.01); A01N 57/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A01N 25/04 (2013.01); A01N 43/40 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. A01N 43/40 + A01N 43/653 + A01N 25/04
  2. A01N 43/40 + A01N 2300/00

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0219821A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0219821 A1 20020314; AR 030943 A1 20030903; AT 274299 T 20040915; AU 7997201 A 20020322; CZ 20030576 A3 20040114; CZ 296113 B6 20060111; DE 60105178 D1 20040930; DE 60105178 T2 20050915; DK 1317177 T3 20041220; EP 1317177 A1 20030611; EP 1317177 B1 20040825; ES 2225587 T3 20050316; GB 0021786 D0 20001018; HU 0300768 A2 20031128; HU 0300768 A3 20051028; HU 228920 B1 20130628; JP 2004508306 A 20040318; JP 5101784 B2 20121219; NO 20031005 A 20030304; NO 20031005 D0 20030304; NO 329343 B1 20101004; NZ 523788 A 20040827; PL 203122 B1 20090831; PL 360579 A1 20040906; SK 2582003 A3 20040302; SK 287365 B6 20100809; US 2004014800 A1 20040122; US 7241454 B2 20070710

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-11-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20170726

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170726

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-11-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170818

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170810

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-11-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20170725

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20170726

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170816

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170720

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170725

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170914

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170726

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170825

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-09-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170814

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-09-29 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20170803

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-10-31 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SYNGENTA LIMITED, GB

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY, WILMINGTON, US

- Document: DE 60105178

- Effective date: 20130909

2013-10-31 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SYNGENTA LIMITED, GUILDFORD, GB

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY, WILMINGTON, DEL., US

- Document: DE 60105178

- Effective date: 20130909

2013-10-31 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60105178

- Representative's name: HOFFMANN - EITLE, DE

- Effective date: 20130909

2013-10-31 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60105178

- Representative's name: HOFFMANN - EITLE PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE PA, DE

- Effective date: 20130909

2013-10-25 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: SYNGENTA LIMITED, GB

- Effective date: 20130923

2013-10-23 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20130926 AND 20131002

2013-10-08 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: SYNGENTA LIMITED

- Effective date: 20130926

2013-09-11 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20130903

2013-09-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60105178

- Representative's name: HOFFMANN - EITLE, DE

2013-08-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: SYNGENTA LIMITED, GB

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: E. I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY, US

2013-06-12 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20130516 AND 20130522

2013-05-24 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY, US

- Effective date: 20130423

2013-05-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS & COMPANY, US

- Document: AT 274299 T

- Effective date: 20130322

2013-05-08 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY

- Effective date: 20130424

2013-03-21 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SYNGENTA LTD., GU2 7YH GUILDFORD, GB

- Document: DE 60105178

- Effective date: 20130128

2013-03-21 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SYNGENTA LIMITED, GB

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SYNGENTA LTD., GU2 7YH GUILDFORD, GB

- Document: DE 60105178

- Effective date: 20130128

2013-03-21 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SYNGENTA LIMITED, GUILDFORD, GB

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SYNGENTA LTD., GU2 7YH GUILDFORD, SURREY, GB

- Document: DE 60105178

- Effective date: 20130128

2013-03-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60105178

- Representative's name: HOFFMANN - EITLE, DE

- Effective date: 20130128

2013-03-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60105178

- Representative's name: HOFFMANN - EITLE PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE PA, DE

- Effective date: 20130128

2013-02-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG, CH

2013-02-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: E. I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SYNGENTA LIMITED, GB

2013-02-13 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20130208

2013-01-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG, CH

2013-01-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: E. I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SYNGENTA LIMITED, GB

2013-01-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60105178

- Representative's name: HOFFMANN - EITLE, DE

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050125

2005-08-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-08-21 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050821

2005-08-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050526

2005-07-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2225587 T3

2005-02-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20040825

2004-12-21 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-12-20 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2004-11-25 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041125

2004-09-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60105178 P 20040930

2004-09-22 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-08-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-08-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-08-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-08-25 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040825

2003-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030407

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI