Global Patent Index - EP 1317208 A1

EP 1317208 A1 2003-06-11 - PARTICULATE CONTRAST AGENTS FOR PICTORIALLY DEPICTING THROMBI BY MEANS OF NUCLEAR SPIN TOMOGRAPHY

Title (en)

PARTICULATE CONTRAST AGENTS FOR PICTORIALLY DEPICTING THROMBI BY MEANS OF NUCLEAR SPIN TOMOGRAPHY

Title (de)

PARTIKULÄRE KONTRASTMITTEL ZUR BILDLICHEN DARSTELLUNG VON THROMBEN MITTELS KERNSPINTOMOGRAPHIE

Title (fr)

AGENTS DE CONTRASTE PARTICULAIRES DE REPRESENTATION PAR IMAGES DE THROMBUS PAR TOMOGRAPHIE A SPIN NUCLEAIRE

Publication

EP 1317208 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01980343 A

Priority

  • DE 10046514 A
  • EP 0110233 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0222011A1] The invention relates to a novel method for pictorially depicting and diagnosing thrombi and to the use of particle suspensions for producing contrast agents for depicting thrombin by means of nuclear spin tomography.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61B 5/055

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61B 5/055 (2006.01); A61B 5/026 (2006.01); A61B 5/0275 (2006.01); A61K 49/00 (2006.01); A61K 49/18 (2006.01); G01R 33/28 (2006.01); G01R 33/48 (2006.01); A61B 6/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01R 33/5601 (2013.01); A61B 5/0263 (2013.01); A61B 5/0275 (2013.01); A61K 49/1863 (2013.01); A61B 5/055 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0222011A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0222011 A1 20020321; AU 1220702 A 20020326; DE 10046514 A1 20020425; EP 1317208 A1 20030611; JP 2004508123 A 20040318; NO 20031204 A 20030317; NO 20031204 D0 20030317; TW I239830 B 20050921

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-18 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090323

2010-12-02 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2010-10-20 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT

2009-08-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYER SCHERING PHARMA AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2009-05-06 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2009-04-29 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2008-12-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61B 5/055 20060101AFI20081120BHEP

2008-12-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 49/18 20060101ALI20081120BHEP

2008-12-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G01R 33/28 20060101ALI20081120BHEP

2008-12-24 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PARTICULATE CONTRAST AGENTS FOR PICTORIALLY DEPICTING THROMBI BY MEANS OF NUCLEAR SPIN TOMOGRAPHY

2007-03-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-05-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040331

2003-06-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: INSTITUT FUER DIAGNOSTIKFORSCHUNG GMBH AN DER FREI

2003-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030131

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI