Global Patent Index - EP 1317224 A1

EP 1317224 A1 2003-06-11 - BAG FOR PACKAGING SUBSTANCES COMPRISING AN INTEGRATED CANNULA AND STRIP FORMED WITH SAME

Title (en)

BAG FOR PACKAGING SUBSTANCES COMPRISING AN INTEGRATED CANNULA AND STRIP FORMED WITH SAME

Title (de)

BEUTEL ZUM VERPACKEN EINER SUBSTANZ MIT INTEGRIERTER KANÜLE UND BAND AUS SOLCHEN BEUTELN

Title (fr)

SACHET DE CONDITIONNEMENT DE SUBSTANCE A CANULE INTEGREE ET BANDE CONSTITUEE DE TELS SACHETS

Publication

EP 1317224 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 01972152 A

Priority

  • FR 0102836 W
  • FR 0011625 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0222044A1] The invention concerns a bag for packaging a liquid biological substance, such as animal semen, which is formed by two plastic walls (10, 11) assembled so as to define a pouch (P) for receiving said substance and, communicating with said pouch, an emptying conduit (3) whereof the end part (30) is, when the bag is closed, sealed by said assembled walls. Said bag is characterised in that it comprises, force-fitted in said conduit (3), a cannula (4) whereof the two ends are open, its first end (41) being adapted to communicate with said pouch (P), while its second end (40) located proximate to the end part (30) of the conduit (3) has a truncated or more less truncated contraction, and said conduit (3) communicates, over a fraction of its length, with at least a zone (5) located not far from the end part (30), wherein the two walls (10, 11) are not joined.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61D 19/02; B65D 77/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61D 19/02 (2006.01); A61J 1/10 (2006.01); B65D 77/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61D 19/022 (2013.01); B65D 77/283 (2013.01); Y10S 383/906 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0222044A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0222044 A1 20020321; AT 324084 T 20060515; AU 9194301 A 20020326; DE 60119136 D1 20060601; DE 60119136 T2 20070125; DK 1317224 T3 20060828; EP 1317224 A1 20030611; EP 1317224 B1 20060426; ES 2263658 T3 20061216; FR 2813784 A1 20020315; FR 2813784 B1 20030307; US 2003163110 A1 20030828; US 7150734 B2 20061219

INPADOC legal status


2018-09-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20171016

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-11-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20170823

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-11-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170816

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-11-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170920

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170907

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170914

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170918

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170911

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-09-07 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-09-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060426

2008-09-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20080222

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060912

2008-07-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060426

2008-06-25 [27C] TERMINATION OF OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Effective date: 20080222

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060727

2007-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-05-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: IMV TECHNOLOGIES

2007-03-07 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: IMV TECHNOLOGIES

- Effective date: 20070126

2006-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2263658 T3

2006-11-15 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2006-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060930

2006-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060930

2006-09-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060930

2006-09-26 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060926

2006-09-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060821

2006-08-28 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2006-07-26 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060726

2006-06-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60119136 P 20060601

2006-05-31 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: FRENCH

2006-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2006-04-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-04-26 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060426

2006-04-26 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060426

2006-04-26 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060426

2006-04-26 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT

- Owner name: EURL PIG'INS

2006-04-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PIG'INS, EURL

2003-11-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031006

2003-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030311

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI