Global Patent Index - EP 1317229 A2

EP 1317229 A2 2003-06-11 - SELECTIVELY ETCHED RADIOPAQUE INTRALUMINAL DEVICE

Title (en)

SELECTIVELY ETCHED RADIOPAQUE INTRALUMINAL DEVICE

Title (de)

SELEKTIV-GEÄTZTE, RADIOPAQUE, INTRALUMINALE VORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF INTRALUMINAL RADIO-OPAQUE GRAVE SELECTIVEMENT

Publication

EP 1317229 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01984625 A

Priority

  • US 0128850 W
  • US 65957100 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0222050A2] The present invention relates to intraluminal devices, in particular stents, having radiopaque material selectively affixed thereon, and to a method of making the same.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61F 2/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61F 2/856 (2013.01); A61F 2/91 (2013.01); A61F 2/915 (2013.01); A61B 19/00 (2006.01); A61F 2/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61F 2/856 (2013.01); A61F 2/91 (2013.01); A61F 2/915 (2013.01); A61B 90/39 (2016.02); A61F 2002/91541 (2013.01); A61F 2002/91558 (2013.01); A61F 2250/0098 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0222050A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0222050 A2 20020321; WO 0222050 A3 20020912; WO 0222050 A9 20030912; AU 1865402 A 20020326; CA 2421797 A1 20020321; EP 1317229 A2 20030611

INPADOC legal status


2013-10-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130403

2007-08-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070628

2003-07-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BOSTON SCIENTIFIC LIMITED

2003-07-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BOSTON SCIENTIFIC IRELAND LIMITED, BARBADOS HEAD O

2003-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030305

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI