Global Patent Index - EP 1317325 A1

EP 1317325 A1 2003-06-11 - FOUNDRY ROLLING UNIT

Title (en)

FOUNDRY ROLLING UNIT

Title (de)

GIESSWALZANLAGE

Title (fr)

INSTALLATION DE COULEE ET LAMINAGE

Publication

EP 1317325 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01971704 A

Priority

  • DE 0103455 W
  • DE 10045085 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0222283A1] The invention relates to a foundry rolling unit, comprising a first production line (I), with at least one casting machine (1, 11), the thin slabs (2, 12) of which may be introduced into at least one tunnel furnace (3, 13), whereby said tunnel furnace (3, 13) opens out into at least one finishing train (4), with at least one mill stand (5). After leaving the finishing train (4) the rolled hot strips may be introduced into at least one cooling run (7) and may be rolled on at least one coiler (8). The foundry rolling unit furthermore comprises a second production line (II) arranged in an at least partly parallel manner in terms of production, with at least one slab introducing device (20), through which the slabs (22) may be introduced into at least one reheating oven (23) and at least one cogging stand (24) arranged thereafter. The rolled pre-strips may be obtained as coils (25) from at least one coil-box (26). The foundry rolling unit further comprises a coil transport device (27), by means of which the coils (25) may be transferred before the finishing train (4), from the second production line (II) to the first production line (I). The coils (25) may be removed from the coil box (26) and transported to the input of the finishing train (4), in order to carry out introduction of the pre-strips. By means of the above it is possible to produce a complete spectrum of different steel types, in particular stainless steel and high-alloyed steel, whilst achieving a corresponding high throughput.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21B 1/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 1/00 (2006.01); B21B 1/46 (2006.01); B22D 11/12 (2006.01); B22D 11/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 1/466 (2013.01); Y10T 29/5184 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0222283A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0222283 A1 20020321; AU 9162901 A 20020326; CN 1268450 C 20060809; CN 1454124 A 20031105; DE 10045085 A1 20020404; DE 10045085 C2 20020718; EP 1317325 A1 20030611; EP 1317325 B1 20050817; JP 2004508199 A 20040318; US 2003150091 A1 20030814

INPADOC legal status


2018-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170907

2018-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20180404

2018-04-04 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50107143

2017-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160930

2017-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160907

2017-06-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170531

2017-05-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160907

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160922

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-12-11 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: PRIMETALS TECHNOLOGIES GERMANY GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20151105

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150910

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150909

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-09-10 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-08-27 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: PRIMETALS TECHNOLOGIES GERMANY GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, 80333 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 50107143

2010-12-08 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20081116

2006-06-21 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SMS DEMAG AG

- Effective date: 20060517

2006-05-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-09-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50107143 P 20050922

2005-09-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050818

2005-08-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-08-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-05-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040413

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030213

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR