Global Patent Index - EP 1317327 A1

EP 1317327 A1 2003-06-11 - METAL-CASTING METHOD AND APPARATUS, CASTING SYSTEM AND CAST-FORGING SYSTEM

Title (en)

METAL-CASTING METHOD AND APPARATUS, CASTING SYSTEM AND CAST-FORGING SYSTEM

Title (de)

METALLGIESSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG, SYSTEM UND GIESS-SCHMIEDE-SYSTEM

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE COULEE DE METAL, SYSTEME DE COULEE ET SYSTEME DE FORGEAGE DE PIECES COULEES

Publication

EP 1317327 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01961268 A

Priority

  • JP 0107553 W
  • JP 2000266271 A
  • JP 2000266665 A
  • JP 2000297636 A
  • US 25137900 P
  • US 25138200 P
  • US 25138100 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0218072A1] An automatic continuous casting system for producing a cast body, comprising: a casting apparatus that makes use of unidirectional solidification of molten metal and includes a molten metal reservoir (4) and a mold (5), in which molten metal in a molten metal source (2) is supplied through transfer means (3) to the molten reservoir, and the molten metal (45) supplied into the molten metal reservoir is suplied through an opening/closing plug (43) into the mold; target weight calculation/storing means (8) for calculating, on the basis of compositional proportions of metal elements contained in the molten metal (45), a specific gravity of an alloy obtained through solidification of the molten metal, calculating a target weight of a cast body on the basis of the specific gravity of the alloy and a capacity of the mold, and memorizing and storing the target weight; and first molten metal supply amount regulation means (9) for regulating an amount of the molten metal supplied from the molten metal reservoir into the mold by obtaining a measurement weight of the cast body and comparing a measurement weight of the cast body and comparing the measurement weight with the target weight.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 39/04; B22D 7/00; B22D 7/06; B22D 9/00; B22D 27/04; B22D 29/04; B22D 35/00; B22D 39/00; B22D 39/04; B22D 47/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 7/06 (2006.01); B22D 9/00 (2006.01); B22D 15/04 (2006.01); B22D 27/04 (2006.01); B22D 29/04 (2006.01); B22D 39/04 (2006.01); B22D 47/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 47/00 (2013.01); B22D 7/06 (2013.01); B22D 9/003 (2013.01); B22D 15/04 (2013.01); B22D 27/045 (2013.01); B22D 29/04 (2013.01); B22D 39/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 0218072 A1 20020307; WO 0218072 A8 20020711; AU 8258901 A 20020313; EP 1317327 A1 20030611; EP 1317327 A4 20050831

INPADOC legal status


2007-04-25 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20061129

2005-08-31 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20050715

2005-05-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 21D 39/04 A

2005-05-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 22D 39/00 B

2005-05-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 22D 35/00 B

2005-05-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 22D 29/04 B

2005-05-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 22D 47/00 B

2005-05-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 22D 27/04 B

2005-05-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 22D 7/00 B

2005-05-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 22D 7/06 B

2005-05-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 22D 9/00 B

2005-05-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 22D 39/04 B

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB LI

2003-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020506

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI