Global Patent Index - EP 1317342 A2

EP 1317342 A2 2003-06-11 - INK JET PRINTING DEVICE

Title (en)

INK JET PRINTING DEVICE

Title (de)

TINTENSTRAHL-DRUCKVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'IMPRESSION A JET D'ENCRE

Publication

EP 1317342 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01976229 A

Priority

  • EP 0110732 W
  • IT BZ20000037 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0222362A2] The invention relates to an ink jet printing device (10) for various media, comprising a printing head device (14) having at least one printing head (16) for printing the medium (101), and a printing table (110) for positioning and/or guiding the medium to be printed (101). The ink jet printing device also comprises an adjustment device for changing the distance between the printing head device (14) and the medium (101) in a direction which is perpendicular to the guiding surface; and a control device (120). A base body (12) and/or a printing table (110) are arranged on a machine frame (11), and a bearing or guiding surface for a medium (101) is configured in one plane on either the base body or the printing table, a feeding device being arranged on one of the two, or both, for guiding through an approximately intrinsically rigid medium (101). A printing head device (14), which is arranged along a transversal guideway located on the machine frame (11) and extending parallel to the plane and transversally in relation to the feeding direction (137), can be moved by means of an adjustment drive and comprises a plurality of nozzles (114) for supplying the ink. The outlets (138) of the nozzles (114) are distributed in a level plane (139) which is parallel to the aforementioned plane.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 25/308; B41J 11/20; B41J 13/08; B41J 15/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/01 (2006.01); B41J 3/407 (2006.01); B41J 11/00 (2006.01); B41J 11/02 (2006.01); B41J 11/06 (2006.01); B41J 11/20 (2006.01); B41J 13/00 (2006.01); B41J 13/02 (2006.01); B41J 13/10 (2006.01); B41J 15/00 (2006.01); B41J 15/04 (2006.01); B41J 15/16 (2006.01); B41J 25/308 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 25/3086 (2013.01); B41J 3/4078 (2013.01); B41J 11/0065 (2013.01); B41J 11/007 (2013.01); B41J 11/0085 (2013.01); B41J 11/06 (2013.01); B41J 11/20 (2013.01); B41J 13/0072 (2013.01); B41J 15/005 (2013.01); B41J 15/046 (2013.01); B41J 15/165 (2013.01); B41J 25/308 (2013.01); B41J 15/048 (2013.01); B65H 2301/212 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0222362A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0222362 A2 20020321; WO 0222362 A3 20030116; AU 4049201 A 20020326; AU 9556801 A 20020326; EP 1317342 A2 20030611; EP 1317342 B1 20140423; ES 2479190 T3 20140723; IT 1316139 B1 20030328; IT BZ20000037 A1 20020315; IT BZ20000037 D0 20000915; JP 2004508972 A 20040325; JP 5006501 B2 20120822; US 2004017456 A1 20040129; WO 0222368 A1 20020321

INPADOC legal status


2018-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180607

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20171009

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170914

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170912

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170915

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170915

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-09-15 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-09-01 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-07-29 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20140423

2016-01-07 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-08-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140917

2015-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-06-17 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2015-05-07 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 50116395

- Effective date: 20150126

2015-04-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20140917

2015-04-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20140423

2015-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-04-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20150126

2015-01-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20140423

2015-01-26 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 50116395

2014-12-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20140825

2014-11-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20140423

2014-10-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20140423

2014-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20140423

2014-10-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20140724

2014-10-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20140423

2014-09-24 [REG NL VDEP] INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED

- Effective date: 20140423

2014-07-23 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2479190 T3

- Effective date: 20140723

2014-06-05 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 50116395

- Effective date: 20140605

2014-05-21 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2014-05-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 663571 T

- Effective date: 20140515

2014-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2014-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2014-04-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2013-12-04 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20131112

2013-06-26 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20130605

2003-10-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030324

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI