Global Patent Index - EP 1317346 A1

EP 1317346 A1 2003-06-11 - DATA CARRIER, METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF AND GRAVURE PRINTING PLATE

Title (en)

DATA CARRIER, METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF AND GRAVURE PRINTING PLATE

Title (de)

DATENTRÄGER, VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG UND STICHTIEFDRUCKPLATTE

Title (fr)

SUPPORT DE DONNEES, SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION ET PLAQUE D'IMPRESSION HELIO

Publication

EP 1317346 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01969698 A

Priority

  • DE 10044464 A
  • EP 0110287 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0220274A1] The invention relates to a data carrier comprising a security element which can be at least visually checked and which comprises embossing in at least one partial area. Said embossing is a half-tone blind embossing carried out by means of colourfast gravure printing. The invention also relates to a method for producing the data carrier, and a printing plate for blind embossing a security element.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41M 3/14; B41M 1/24; B41N 1/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41M 1/10 (2006.01); B41M 1/24 (2006.01); B41M 3/14 (2006.01); B41N 1/06 (2006.01); B42D 25/00 (2014.01); B42D 25/29 (2014.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B42D 15/00 (2013.01); B41M 1/24 (2013.01); B41M 3/14 (2013.01); B41N 1/06 (2013.01); B42D 25/00 (2014.10); B42D 25/29 (2014.10); B42D 25/324 (2014.10); B42D 25/425 (2014.10); B42D 2035/24 (2013.01); B42D 2035/26 (2013.01); Y10S 283/901 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0220274A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0220274 A1 20020314; AT 270193 T 20040715; AU 2001289869 A2 20020322; AU 2001289869 B2 20050929; AU 2001289869 C1 20060810; AU 8986901 A 20020322; BR 0113767 A 20030624; CA 2421501 A1 20030304; CA 2421501 C 20090609; CN 1242887 C 20060222; CN 1452561 A 20031029; DE 10044464 A1 20020321; DE 10044464 B4 20110922; EP 1317346 A1 20030611; EP 1317346 B1 20040630; ES 2223915 T3 20050301; HK 1059418 A1 20060630; JP 2004508226 A 20040318; MX PA03001765 A 20030910; PL 198878 B1 20080731; PL 359719 A1 20040906; PT 1317346 E 20040930; RU 2264920 C2 20051127; TR 200401737 T4 20040921; US 2008290647 A1 20081127; US 7686341 B2 20100330; ZA 200301515 B 20031107

INPADOC legal status


2011-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20040630

2011-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20040630

2011-03-29 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

2011-03-15 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20110307

2011-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20100921

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101129

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-02-02 [27W] PATENT REVOKED

- Effective date: 20100916

2011-02-02 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Effective date: 20100916

2011-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20100921

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-01-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100924

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20100920

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100930

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100924

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20100921

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-10-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20100923

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-10-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100921

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-07-07 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: KBA-GIORI S.A.

- Effective date: 20050324

2010-07-07 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: DE LA RUE INTERNATIONAL LIMITED

- Effective date: 20050324

2010-07-07 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: OESTERREICHISCHE BANKNOTEN- U. SICHERHEITSDRUCK GM

- Effective date: 20050329

2009-11-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20090828

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-11-30 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20090828

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-06-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: KBA-GIORI S.A.

2009-06-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: DE LA RUE INTERNATIONAL LIMITED

2009-06-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: OESTERREICHISCHE BANKNOTEN- U. SICHERHEITSDRUCK GM

2009-04-15 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: KBA-GIORI S.A.

- Effective date: 20050324

2009-04-15 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: DE LA RUE INTERNATIONAL LIMITED

- Effective date: 20050324

2009-04-15 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: OESTERREICHISCHE BANKNOTEN- U. SICHERHEITSDRUCK GM

- Effective date: 20050329

2007-07-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: KBA-GIORI S.A.

2007-07-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: DE LA RUE INTERNATIONAL LIMITED

2007-07-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: OESTERREICHISCHE BANKNOTEN- U. SICHERHEITSDRUCK GM

2007-04-25 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: KBA-GIORI S.A.

- Effective date: 20050324

2007-04-25 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: DE LA RUE INTERNATIONAL LIMITED

- Effective date: 20050324

2007-04-25 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: OESTERREICHISCHE BANKNOTEN- U. SICHERHEITSDRUCK GM

- Effective date: 20050329

2005-10-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: KBA-GIORI S.A.

2005-10-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: DE LA RUE INTERNATIONAL LIMITED

2005-10-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: OESTERREICHISCHE BANKNOTEN- U. SICHERHEITSDRUCK GM

2005-09-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: KBA-GIORI S.A.

2005-09-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: DE LA RUE INTERNATIONAL LIMITED

2005-09-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: OESTERREICHISCHE BANKNOTEN- U. SICHERHEITSDRUCK GM

2005-08-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: KBA-GIORI S.A.

2005-08-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: DE LA RUE INTERNATIONAL LIMITED

2005-08-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: OESTERREICHISCHE BANKNOTEN- U. SICHERHEITSDRUCK GM

2005-07-27 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: KBA-GIORI S.A.

- Effective date: 20050324

2005-07-27 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: DE LA RUE INTERNATIONAL LIMITED

- Effective date: 20050324

2005-07-27 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: OESTERREICHISCHE BANKNOTEN- U. SICHERHEITSDRUCK GM

- Effective date: 20050329

2005-06-22 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: KBA-GIORI S.A.

- Effective date: 20050323

2005-06-22 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: DE LA RUE INTERNATIONAL LIMITED

- Effective date: 20050324

2005-06-22 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: OESTERREICHISCHE BANKNOTEN- U. SICHERHEITSDRUCK GM

- Effective date: 20050329

2005-06-01 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: KBA-GIORI S.A.

- Effective date: 20050323

2005-06-01 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: DE LA RUE INTERNATIONAL LIMITED

- Effective date: 20050324

2005-06-01 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: OESTERREICHISCHE BANKNOTEN- U. SICHERHEITSDRUCK GM

- Effective date: 20050329

2005-05-25 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: KBA-GIORI S.A.

- Effective date: 20050323

2005-05-25 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: DE LA RUE INTERNATIONAL LIMITED

- Effective date: 20050324

2005-05-25 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: OESTERREICHISCHE BANKNOTEN- U. SICHERHEITSDRUCK GM

- Effective date: 20050329

2005-03-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2223915 T3

2004-12-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-12-27 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-10-26 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-09-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20040719

2004-09-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040823

2004-09-06 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040906

2004-08-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2004-08-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50102760 P 20040805

2004-07-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-06-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-06-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040630

2003-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030408

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI