Global Patent Index - EP 1317349 A1

EP 1317349 A1 2003-06-11 - GRAVURE PRINTING PLATE AND VALUABLE DOCUMENT PRODUCED BY THE SAME

Title (en)

GRAVURE PRINTING PLATE AND VALUABLE DOCUMENT PRODUCED BY THE SAME

Title (de)

STICHTIEFDRUCKPLATTE UND DAMIT HERGESTELLTES WERTDOKUMENT

Title (fr)

PLAQUE D'HELIOGRAVURE ET DOCUMENT DE VALEUR PRODUIT AVEC CELLE-CI

Publication

EP 1317349 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01962997 A

Priority

  • DE 10044711 A
  • EP 0110227 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0220279A1] The invention relates to a gravure printing plate for producing a printed image, comprising at least one engraved area in the printing plate surface. Said printing plate is characterised in that the engraved area comprises at least one structural element, the edge area thereof having a larger engraving depth than the inner area, the edge area and the inner area are directly adjacent to each other, and the inner area is embodied as a sunken plateau in relation to the printing plate surface. The invention also relates to a method for producing said printing plates, a data carrier comprising a printed image produced by means of the gravure printing process, and a method for gravure printing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41N 1/06; B41M 1/10; B41M 3/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41C 1/045 (2006.01); B41M 1/10 (2006.01); B41M 3/14 (2006.01); B41N 1/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41M 3/14 (2013.01); B41M 1/10 (2013.01); B41N 1/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0220279A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0220279 A1 20020314; AT 269791 T 20040715; AU 2001284053 A2 20020322; AU 2001284053 B2 20051027; AU 8405301 A 20020322; BR 0113769 A 20030729; BR 0113769 B1 20101214; CA 2421099 A1 20030304; CA 2421099 C 20081230; CN 1244457 C 20060308; CN 1452565 A 20031029; DE 10044711 A1 20020321; EP 1317349 A1 20030611; EP 1317349 B1 20040623; ES 2223001 T3 20050216; HK 1059419 A1 20060707; JP 2004508227 A 20040318; MX PA03002016 A 20040504; PL 199462 B1 20080930; PL 359718 A1 20040906; PT 1317349 E 20041029; RU 2258613 C2 20050820; TR 200401898 T4 20040921; US 2004025728 A1 20040212; US 7104193 B2 20060912; ZA 200301455 B 20040217

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-09 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

2014-07-22 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

2014-05-15 [REG AT MA03] REVOCATION OF THE PATENT

- Document: AT 269791 T

- Effective date: 20130918

2014-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20040623

2014-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20040623

2014-04-30 [REG DE R107] PUBLICATION OF GRANT OF EUROPEAN PATENT RESCINDED

- Document: DE 50102693

- Effective date: 20140430

2014-03-26 [27W] PATENT REVOKED

- Effective date: 20130918

2014-03-26 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Effective date: 20130918

2014-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130918

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130920

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-11-29 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20130828

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20130920

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20130920

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130923

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130930

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-10-22 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20131022

2013-09-18 [REG DE R064] EPO'S REVOCATION DECISION NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 50102693

2013-09-18 [REG DE R103] PATENT REVOKED BY EPO

- Document: DE 50102693

2013-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120905

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120919

- Year of fee payment: 12

2013-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20120919

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-11-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110923

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-07-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110404

2011-05-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110307

2011-03-23 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: KBA-NOTASYS SA

- Effective date: 20050321

2011-03-23 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: DE LA RUE INTERNATIONAL LIMITED

- Effective date: 20050322

2011-03-15 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20110307

2010-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100924

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-05-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20090923

- Year of fee payment: 9

2010-04-28 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: KBA-GIORI S.A.

- Effective date: 20050321

2010-04-28 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: DE LA RUE INTERNATIONAL LIMITED

- Effective date: 20050322

2009-11-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20090828

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-06-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: KBA-GIORI S.A.

2009-06-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: DE LA RUE INTERNATIONAL LIMITED

2009-04-15 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: KBA-GIORI S.A.

- Effective date: 20050321

2009-04-15 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: DE LA RUE INTERNATIONAL LIMITED

- Effective date: 20050322

2007-07-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: KBA-GIORI S.A.

2007-07-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: DE LA RUE INTERNATIONAL LIMITED

2007-04-25 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: KBA-GIORI S.A.

- Effective date: 20050321

2007-04-25 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: DE LA RUE INTERNATIONAL LIMITED

- Effective date: 20050322

2005-09-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: KBA-GIORI S.A.

2005-09-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: DE LA RUE INTERNATIONAL LIMITED

2005-08-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: KBA-GIORI S.A.

2005-08-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: DE LA RUE INTERNATIONAL LIMITED

2005-07-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: KBA-GIORI S.A.

2005-06-29 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: KBA-GIORI S.A.

- Effective date: 20050321

2005-06-29 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: DE LA RUE INTERNATIONAL LIMITED

- Effective date: 20050322

2005-06-22 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: KBA-GIORI S.A.

- Effective date: 20050321

2005-06-22 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: DE LA RUE INTERNATIONAL LIMITED

- Effective date: 20050322

2005-06-01 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: KBA-GIORI S.A.

- Effective date: 20050321

2005-06-01 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: DE LA RUE INTERNATIONAL LIMITED

- Effective date: 20050322

2005-05-18 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: KBA-GIORI S.A.

- Effective date: 20050321

2005-03-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2223001 T3

2005-01-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-11-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20040623

2004-10-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20040823

2004-10-19 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-10-05 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20040402740

2004-09-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-23 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040923

2004-09-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040823

2004-09-05 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040905

2004-08-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2004-07-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50102693 P 20040729

2004-07-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-06-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-06-23 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040623

2004-06-23 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040623

2004-06-23 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040623

2003-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030408

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI