Global Patent Index - EP 1317351 A1

EP 1317351 A1 2003-06-11 - DATA SUPPORT WITH AN OPTICALLY VARIABLE ELEMENT

Title (en)

DATA SUPPORT WITH AN OPTICALLY VARIABLE ELEMENT

Title (de)

DATENTRÄGER MIT EINEM OPTISCH VARIABLEN ELEMENT

Title (fr)

SUPPORT DE DONNEES DOTE D'UN ELEMENT OPTIQUEMENT VARIABLE

Publication

EP 1317351 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01982255 A

Priority

  • DE 10044465 A
  • EP 0110288 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0220280A1] The invention relates to a data support (1) with an optically variable structure (2) which has an embossed structure and a coating that contrasts with the surface of the data support (1). Said embossed structure and said coating are combined in such a way that when the structure is viewed in a vertical position, at least parts of the coating are completely visible while when the structure is viewed at an angle, said parts are concealed, so that a tilting effect is produced when the structure is viewed alternately in the vertical position and at an angle. The coating is uniform, while the embossed structure is divided into partial areas in which different partial embossed structures are provided.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B42D 15/00; B42D 15/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42D 15/00 (2006.01); B42D 25/29 (2014.01); B42D 25/328 (2014.01); B42D 25/425 (2014.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B42D 25/324 (2014.10); B42D 25/29 (2014.10); B42D 25/328 (2013.01); B42D 25/425 (2014.10); B44B 5/026 (2013.01); B42D 2035/16 (2013.01); B42D 2035/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0220280A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0220280 A1 20020314; AT 516153 T 20110715; AU 1388802 A 20020322; CA 2421101 A1 20030304; CA 2421101 C 20070717; CN 1262430 C 20060705; CN 1452566 A 20031029; DE 10044465 A1 20020321; EP 1317351 A1 20030611; EP 1317351 B1 20110713; HK 1059068 A1 20060929; PL 213140 B1 20130131; PL 359706 A1 20040906; RU 2280561 C2 20060727; US 8137899 B1 20120320

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-06 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: GIESECKE+DEVRIENT CURRENCY TECHNOLOGY GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20180530

2018-06-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: GIESECKE+DEVRIENT CURRENCY TECHNOLOGY GMBH, DE

- Document: AT 516153 T

- Effective date: 20180425

2018-02-14 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20180118 AND 20180124

2018-01-31 [REG NL PD] CHANGE OF OWNERSHIP

- Owner name: GIESECKE+DEVRIENT CURRENCY TECHNOLOGY GMBH; DE

- Free text: DETAILS ASSIGNMENT: CHANGE OF OWNER(S), ASSIGNMENT; FORMER OWNER NAME: GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH

- Effective date: 20171205

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170930

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170925

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170920

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-11-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170925

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-11-30 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: GIESECKE+DEVRIENT CURRENCY TECHNOLOGY GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: GIESECKE AND DEVRIENT GMBH, DE

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170925

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170925

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170925

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GIESECKE+DEVRIENT CURRENCY TECHNOLOGY GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH, 81677 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 50115923

2017-09-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-08-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140906

2016-09-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-09-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140930

2014-05-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50115923

2014-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20130919

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-11-29 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20130828

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-05-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110906

2013-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20111024

2012-08-09 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 50115923

- Effective date: 20120416

2012-06-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110713

2012-06-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20120416

2012-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110713

2012-04-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110930

2012-04-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110713

2012-02-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20111014

2012-02-29 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110713

2012-02-15 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2012-01-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20111114

2012-01-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110713

2011-11-29 [REG SE RPOT] EP PATENT HAS BEEN REPUBLISHED WITH A CORRECTED SWEDISH TRANSLATION

2011-11-01 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2011-10-26 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

2011-10-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2011-09-01 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 50115923

- Effective date: 20110901

2011-08-24 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: MUELLER, JOHANN

2011-08-24 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: PLASCHKA, REINHARD

2011-08-24 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: ZERBES, JUERGEN

2011-08-24 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: BALDUS, CHRISTOPH

2011-08-17 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2011-07-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2011-07-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2011-07-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2011-07-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GIESECKE+DEVRIENT CURRENCY TECHNOLOGY GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH, 81677 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 50115923

2007-05-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070405

2003-07-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MUELLER, JOHANN

2003-07-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PLASCHKA, REINHARD

2003-07-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ZERBES, JUERGEN

2003-07-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BALDUS, CHRISTOPH

2003-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030408

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI