Global Patent Index - EP 1317368 A1

EP 1317368 A1 2003-06-11 - PENDULUM SUPPORT FOR THE SUPERSTRUCTURE OF A BOGIE

Title (en)

PENDULUM SUPPORT FOR THE SUPERSTRUCTURE OF A BOGIE

Title (de)

PENDELSTÜTZE ZUR ABSTÜTZUNG EINES WAGENKASTENS AN EINEM DREHGESTELL

Title (fr)

SUPPORT OSCILLANT POUR SOUTENIR LA SUPERSTRUCTURE D'UN BOGIE

Publication

EP 1317368 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01969639 A

Priority

  • DE 10044992 A
  • EP 0109782 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0220326A1] The invention relates to a pendulum support for the superstructure of a bogie, comprising an upper frame-shaped support piece (21), a lower frame-shaped support piece (22) and an optionally central support piece (23) consisting of multiple parts. Both frame-shaped support parts (21,22) overlap axially with each other one overlaps as an inner support piece and the other as an outer support piece and both are provided with opposite-lying first roll-off surfaces (46) in relation to a center axis (16), rolling off on counter surfaces (28) of a non-pivotable first or second bearing piece (15,24) and, offset at angle of 90 DEG thereto, second roll-off surfaces (38) rolling off on the central support piece (23). When seen from a sectional view parallel to the center axis (16) and to the surface lines (47) of the first roll-off surface, the frame-shaped support pieces (21,22) are embodied in a respective L shape with an upright limb extending in the direction of the center axis (16), said limb axially overlapping with the upright limb of the other respective frame-shaped support piece (21,22), and provided with a limb extending vertically in relation to the center axis (16). The first roll-off surfaces (46) are substantially disposed in the extension of the upright limb of the frame-shaped support pieces (21,22).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61F 5/14; B61F 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61F 5/02 (2006.01); B61F 5/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61F 5/14 (2013.01); B61F 5/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0220326A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0220326 A1 20020314; DE 10044992 A1 20020321; DE 50109638 D1 20060601; EP 1317368 A1 20030611; EP 1317368 B1 20060426

INPADOC legal status


2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110831

2012-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110824

2012-05-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120430

2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-06-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50109638

- Effective date: 20110301

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100901

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100827

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091026

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-04-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070129

2006-11-22 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20060426

2006-11-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-06-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50109638 P 20060601

2006-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2006-04-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-04-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060426

2005-10-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE FR GB IT LI

2003-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030329

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR